CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L. v. Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L.
Defendant: Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00131
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF DEFAULT By Clerk as to Northern Power Systems, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/18/2019. (law)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Northern Power Systems, Inc. filed by CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Franco Gentile, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wolinsky, Douglas) Event/text clarified on 9/18/2019 (law).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Northern Power Systems, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Wolinsky, Douglas)
July 30, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Northern Power Systems, Inc.(kac)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L. (esb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northern Power Systems, Inc. filed by CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L. v. Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CO.MO.SUD.S.R.L.
Represented By: Douglas J. Wolinsky, Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Edelman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?