Rodriguez v. Touchette et al
Plaintiff: Juan Rodriguez, Jr.
Defendant: Joel Machado and Michael Touchette
Case Number: 5:2019cv00143
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED and #6 MOTION to Amend #5 Complaint is granted. Any amended complaint must be filed by 10/28/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 9/27/2019. (hbc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 and #8 Waivers of Service Returned Executed. The incorrect documents were uploaded at the time of filing. The correct documents are now attached to #7 and #8 . The documents are also attached to this entry. (Attachments: #1 Document 8) (jlh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Joel Machado (individual and official capacity) waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (eh) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/23/2019) (jlh).
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Michael Touchette (individual and official capacity) waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (eh) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/23/2019) (jlh).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #5 Complaint, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Juan Rodriguez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibits) (eh) Date filed corrected on 9/25/2019 (hbc).
August 16, 2019 ISSUED Waiver as to Michael Touchette, Joel Machado. (eh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Michael Touchette and Joel Machado filed by Juan Rodriguez, Jr. Waivers issued. (eh)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Juan Rodriguez, Jr. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/16/2019. (eh)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/16/2019. (eh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Juan Rodriguez, Jr. (eh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Juan Rodriguez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Juan Rodriguez, Jr., #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed))(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Touchette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Touchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?