Lowell et al v. Vermont Department of Children and Families et al
Plaintiff: Miriam Lowell and Seth Healey
Defendant: Catherine Clark, Karen Shea, Christine Johnson, Kathleen Smith, Vermont Department of Children and Families, Emily Carrier, Christine Gadwah, John and Jane Does 1-10, Kathleen Greenmun and Kenneth Schatz
Case Number: 5:2019cv00150
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 32 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 1:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Telephone Conference held on 10/24/2019. C. Hagen, Esq. & D. Shlansky, Esq. present for pltfs. D. Gross, AAG present for dfts. Court makes inquiries re: status of pending motions and abstention issue. Defense counsel requests additional time to file reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. ORDERED: Request granted. Reply is due by 11/1/2019. The court will not be ruling on the #30 PROPOSED Discovery Schedule until a ruling is issued on #8 MOTION to Dismiss. The hearing scheduled for 11/6/2019 will only apply to the Motion to Dismiss. A revised hearing notice will be issued. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED Discovery Schedule/Order by Seth Healey, Miriam Lowell (Hagan, Colin) Text clarified on 10/23/2019 (jlh).
October 17, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (pjl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 3:00 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
September 27, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Kenneth Schatz waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Kathleen Smith waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Kathleen Greenmun waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Karen Shea waiver sent on 8/28/2019. (Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Emily Carrier waiver sent on 8/28/2019. (Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Vermont Department of Children and Families waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Christine Johnson waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Christine Gadwah waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Catherine Clark waiver sent on 8/28/2019.(Hagan, Colin)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/25/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #2 and #3 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/25/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Seth Healey, Miriam Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (same image as Doc. #15 ) (esb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Seth Healey, Miriam Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hagan, Colin) (same image as Doc. #16 )
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on 8/27/2019, before Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne Henry, telephone number 802-747-9193. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. (pjl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 1:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
August 29, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Vermont Department of Children and Families.(gmg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint filed by Miriam Lowell, Seth Healey. The Complaint has been sealed pursuant to the court's oral order (see Document 11). A redacted version is now attached to #1 and this entry. (law)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2019 re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. C. Hagen, Esq. present for plaintiffs. D. Groff, AAG present for defendants. Court makes inquiries and counsel make statements. ORDERED: An order re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction will not issue at this time. The court will schedule another hearing in 60 days as to #5 MOTION for TRO and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #8 MOTION to Dismiss. #9 STIPULATED MOTION to File Under Seal #1 Complaint is granted. A redacted version of the #1 Complaint without defendants addresses is to be filed. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, John and Jane Does 1-10, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith, Vermont Department of Children and Families. (same document as #8 ) (law)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION to File Under Seal #1 Complaint, filed by Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith, Vermont Department of Children and Families. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Redacted)(Groff, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith, Vermont Department of Children and Families. (same document as #10 ) (Groff, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Groff, Esq on behalf of Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith, Vermont Department of Children and Families.(Groff, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for 8/27/2019 at 1:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Seth Healey, Miriam Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David Shlansky, #3 Proposed Order) (esb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Seth Healey, Miriam Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David Shlansky, #3 Proposed Order) (esb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Seth Healey. (Attachments: #1 Main document unredacted (image is sealed), #2 Affidavit of Seth Healey, #3 Affidavit of Seth Healey unredacted (image is sealed))(esb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Miriam Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Main document unredacted (image is sealed), #2 Affidavit of Miriam Lowell, #3 Affidavit of Miriam Lowell unredacted (image is sealed))(esb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (unredacted, document is sealed) against Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, John and Jane Does 1-10, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith, Vermont Department of Children and Families filed by Seth Healey, Miriam Lowell. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #2 Main Document (redacted)) (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowell et al v. Vermont Department of Children and Families et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Gadwah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Greenmun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Lowell
Represented By: Colin R. Hagan, Esq.
Represented By: David J. Shlansky, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Healey
Represented By: Colin R. Hagan, Esq.
Represented By: David J. Shlansky, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?