Clark et al v. Schatz et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Clark and Peggy Price
Defendant: Jody Racht, Luciana Diruocco, Christel Michaud and Ken Schatz
Case Number: 5:2019cv00160
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Luciana Diruocco, Christel Michaud, Jody Racht, Ken Schatz, Motion for Court Appointed Attorney, Motion for Hearing, Motion to Allow Participation by Telephone at Hearing filed by Kimberly Clark. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (esb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights against Luciana Diruocco, Christel Michaud, Jody Racht, Ken Schatz filed by Kimberly Clark. (esb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER granting #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and dismissing #1 Complaint. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by 30 days. Failure to file on or before 11/29/2019 shall result in closure of the case. The court hereby certifies that under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/22/2019. (esb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Kimberly Clark (esb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Kimberly Clark. (esb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Kimberly Clark, Peggy Price. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kimberly Clark, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed)) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Schatz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Racht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luciana Diruocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christel Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?