Burke v. Touchette et al
Petitioner: James Thomas Burke
Respondent: Mike Touchette, David E. Tartter and State of Vermont
Case Number: 5:2019cv00228
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Accepting and Adopting #3 Report and Recommendation re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Transferring the case to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/20/2020. (esb)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 EX PARTE MOTION to Compel a Clerk to Compile Petitioners Printed Case Documents in Their Corrected Numbered Order From Number (1) to Number-#1, 523, i.e. The Printed Case Documents Attached to Writ. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner's #5 Motion and this Order shall be publicly filed as there is no apparent reason for sealing of these documents. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/6/2020. (eh) Unsealed on 1/7/2020 (eh).
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Service) (esb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION to Compel a Clerk to Compile Petitioners Printed Case Documents in Their Corrected Numbered Order From Number (1) to Number-#1, 523, i.e. The Printed Case Documents Attached to Writ filed by James Thomas Burke.(law) Unsealed on 1/7/2020 pursuant to #7 (eh).
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Thomas Burke. The Printed Case Table of Contents V.R.A.P. 30 & 24(c) was not included at the time of filing. It is now attached to #1 and this entry. (law)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the Court find Petitioner's current #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus to be second or successive under 28 U.S.C. 2244(b), and TRANSFER the Petition to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. Objections due by 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/18/2019. (eh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by James Thomas Burke. (eh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Thomas Burke. (Filing fee $ 5.00) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Separate Memorandum 1, #6 Separate Memorandum 2, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (printed case too voluminous to scan, on file in Clerk's Office) (eh) Text clarified on 12/6/2019 (eh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #8 Printed Case Table of Contents V.R.A.P. 30 & 24(c)) (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Touchette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Touchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David E. Tartter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?