The Hoehl Family Foundation v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: The Hoehl Family Foundation
Defendant: Roberts Asset Mgt., LLC, Roberts Asset Management, Kevin D. Gaboriault, Eideard Group, LLC, John P. Aubin and Ronald L. Roberts
Case Number: 5:2019cv00229
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. All Defendants answers due March 6, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 2/4/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 WITHDRAWAL of #5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Partial) As Moot, Without Prejudice by Eideard Group, LLC, Ronald L. Roberts (Borick, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint filed by John P. Aubin, Eideard Group, LLC, Kevin D. Gaboriault, Ronald L. Roberts, Roberts Asset Mgt., LLC.(Borick, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to John P. Aubin, Kevin D. Gaboriault, Roberts Asset Mgt., LLC.(kac)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed on 1/30/2020 as to John P. Aubin, Kevin D. Gaboriault, Roberts Asset Mgt., LLC, a/k/a Roberts Asset Management, LLC of #11 Amended Complaint filed by The Hoehl Family Foundation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spero, Navah)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Amended complaint accepted as timely filed. The one-day delay is inconsequential. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/23/2020. (jal)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Document 9 has been removed from the docket as the pleading cannot be filed electronically. (jlh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eideard Group, LLC, Ronald L. Roberts, John P. Aubin, Kevin D. Gaboriault, Roberts Asset Mgt., LLC filed by The Hoehl Family Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 RedLined Amended Complaint)(esb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Entry has been removed from the docket.
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Eideard Group, LLC (Borick, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Eideard Group, LLC, Ronald L. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Partial) filed by Eideard Group, LLC, Ronald L. Roberts.(Borick, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Affidavit of Service and #2 Affidavit of Service, filed by The Hoehl Family Foundation. The main documents were combined with that of their attachments. The images have been broken apart and replaced on the docket. The images are now separately attached to docs #2 , #3 , and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2- Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Doc 3- Affidavit of Service, #3 Doc 3- Summons in a Civil Action) (eh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Hoehl Family Foundation. Eideard Group, LLC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019(Spero, Navah) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/18/2019) (eh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (eh).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Hoehl Family Foundation. Ronald L. Roberts served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019(Spero, Navah) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/18/2019) (eh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (eh).
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald L. Roberts and Eideard Group, LLC filed by The Hoehl Family Foundation.Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hoehl Family Foundation v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Asset Mgt., LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Asset Management
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D. Gaboriault
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eideard Group, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Aubin
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Roberts
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hoehl Family Foundation
Represented By: Navah C. Spero, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Martin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?