United States of America v. Sturm
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Kenneth Sturm
Case Number: 5:2019cv00239
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing and to Reset Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 2/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing and MOTION to Reset Briefing Deadlines filed by United States of America.(Wille, Jr., Robert) Motion relief added on 02/10/2020 (jlh)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 2/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 2/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/27/2019. (kp)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summonses filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Robert J. Wille, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?