Bates v. University of Vermont Medical Center
Plaintiff: James Bates
Defendant: The University of Vermont Medical Center
Case Number: 5:2020cv00008
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: James W. Spink, Esq. (eh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by The University of Vermont Medical Center.(Andreson, Nicole)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by The University of Vermont Medical Center(Andreson, Nicole)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 3/9/2020. (eh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angela R. Clark, Esq, Nicole Andreson, Esq. on behalf of The University of Vermont Medical Center.(Clark, Angela) Text clarified on 2/18/2020 (law).
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce by The University of Vermont Medical Center.(Andreson, Nicole)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by The University of Vermont Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andreson, Nicole)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by The University of Vermont Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andreson, Nicole)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Andreson, Esq on behalf of The University of Vermont Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andreson, Nicole)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by James Bates. The University of Vermont Medical Center served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020(Blackman, Barbara)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The University of Vermont Medical Center filed by James Bates. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. University of Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bates
Represented By: Barbara R. Blackman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?