Black et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Wesley Wade Black and Laura Black
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00033
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Laura Black, Laura Black(as the mother and natural guardian of R.C.B., an infant under the age of eighteen), Wesley Wade Black.(Tensen, Arend)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Laura Black, Laura Black(as the mother and natural guardian of R.C.B., an infant under the age of eighteen), Wesley Wade Black (Tensen, Arend)
March 16, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(law)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY UPDATE re: #1 Complaint filed by Wesley Wade Black, Laura Black. Exhibits A and B have been sealed in accordance with F. R. Civ. P. 5.2. Redacted versions are now attached to #1 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (redacted)) (law)
March 10, 2020 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Wesley Wade Black, Laura Black, Laura Black (as the mother and natural guardian of R.C.B., an infant under the age of eighteen). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (unredacted, sealed), #2 Exhibit B (unredacted, sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #4 Exhibit A (redacted), #5 Exhibit B (redacted)) (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Wade Black
Represented By: Arend R. Tensen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Black
Represented By: Arend R. Tensen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?