Harrington v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Harrington
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00084
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harold L. Lichten, Matthew W. Thomson, and Zachary L. Rubin. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/21/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harold L. Lichten, Matthew W. Thomson, and Zachary L. Rubin filed by Joshua Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harold L. Lichten, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Matthew W. Thomson, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Affidavit of Zachary L. Rubin, #6 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Puma. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/29/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Puma filed by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Puma, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 6/6/2020, answer due 8/5/2020.(Bok, Geoffrey)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/6/2020, answer due 8/5/2020.(Bok, Geoffrey)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION AND INDIVIDUAL COMPLAINT against Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC filed by Joshua Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Harrington
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Bok, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?