JVD Property Enterprises, Inc. v. 1759, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: JVD Property Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: 1759, Ltd. and Neil Jensen
3Rd Party Defendant: Matot Holdings, Inc., Michael Matot, Lynch & Foley PC and James C Foley, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00263
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER finding as moot #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and to Locate Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/22/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
December 22, 2021 Filing 19 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce to 1759 LTD by James C Foley, Jr, Lynch & Foley PC.(Maass, Andrew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by James C Foley, Jr, Lynch & Foley PC (Maass, Andrew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #7 Third-Party Complaint by James C Foley, Jr, Lynch & Foley PC.(Maass, Andrew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew H. Maass, Esq on behalf of James C Foley, Jr, Lynch & Foley PC.(Maass, Andrew)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Complaint Neil Jensen answer due 1/3/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/7/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint filed by Neil Jensen. (esm)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq on behalf of Michael Matot, Matot Holdings, Inc..(Nelson, Alexandrea)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hannah C. Waite, Esq on behalf of Michael Matot, Matot Holdings, Inc..(Waite, Hannah)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Alexandrea L. Nelson served on 11/22/2021. Answer due by 1/14/2022.(Manitsky, Andrew) Text clarified on 11/23/2021 (jlh).
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. James C. Foley, Jr served on 11/22/2021. Answer due by 12/22/2021.(Manitsky, Andrew) Text clarified on 11/23/2021 (jlh).
November 8, 2021 ISSUED Summons as to James C Foley, Jr, Lynch & Foley PC, Michael Matot, Matot Holdings, Inc.. (eh)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Locate Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint, filed by Neil Jensen. (esm)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Neil Jensen. (esm)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint, THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against Matot Holdings, Inc., Michael Matot, Lynch & Foley PC, James C Foley, Jr filed by 1759, Ltd.. by 1759, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Manitsky, Andrew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by 1759, Ltd. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (originally filed 10/27/2021 in state court) (esm)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. 1759, Ltd. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021; Neil Jensen served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service re: Neil Jensen, #2 Affidavit of Service re: 1759, LTD.) (originally filed 10/8/2021 in state court) (esm)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Foreclosure and to Enforce Security Agreement against 1759, Ltd., Neil Jensen filed by JVD Property Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (originally filed 10/6/2021 in state court) (esm)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division. (esm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 1759, Ltd. from Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division, case number 21-CV-03082. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (esm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JVD Property Enterprises, Inc. v. 1759, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JVD Property Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Frank H. Langrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1759, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew D. Manitsky, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Matot Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Hannah C. Waite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael Matot
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Hannah C. Waite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Lynch & Foley PC
Represented By: Andrew H. Maass, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James C Foley, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew H. Maass, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?