Blackberry Corporation et al v. Coulter
Plaintiff: Blackberry Corporation and Cylance Inc. doing business as Blackberry Cylance
Defendant: Kaylan Brown Coulter, Chris Coulter and Sentinel Labs, Inc. doing business as Sentinelone doing business as Sentinelone.com
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2022cv00098
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 52 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Kaylan Brown Coulter.(Jones, Eric)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(esm)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER finding as moot #44 and #47 MOTIONS for Protective Order. The parties have submitted a stipulated proposed order in a form acceptable to the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/12/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
October 11, 2022 Filing 49 PROPOSED Protective Order by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc. (O'Brien, Evan) Event text modified on 10/11/2022 (esm).
September 16, 2022 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to #44 MOTION for Protective Order and RESPONSE in Opposition to #47 CROSS MOTION to Enter an Alternative Proposed Protective Order filed by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc.. (Coffin, Tristram) Text modified on 9/19/2022 (esm).
September 2, 2022 Filing 47 CROSS MOTION to Enter an Alternative Proposed Protective Order filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Same image as #46 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service) (pjl)
September 2, 2022 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Zidovsky, Matthew) (Same image as #47 MOTION.) Attachment text modified (pjl)
August 29, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Intent to File a Memorandum Opposing #44 MOTION for Protective Order by Kaylan Brown Coulter (Jones, Eric) Text modified on 8/29/2022 (esm).
August 29, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Coffin, Tristram) Attachment text modified on 8/29/2022 (esm).
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Stipulated Protective Order. Time extended to August 29, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 8/25/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
August 22, 2022 Filing 42 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Stipulated Protective Order (7-Day Extension) filed by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(O'Brien, Evan)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENTRY ORDER: re #38 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. The court requests that the parties file a narrowly-drawn proposed order within fourteen days. The order should reserve "confidentiality" for the most sensitive documents and recognizes the public nature of this proceeding, including motion practice and trial. The order should be readily comprehensible to a lay person who may be bound by its provisions and should not exceed four pages, double-spaced. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 8/8/2022. (sjl)
August 8, 2022 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims or Stay Proceeding filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2022 to clarify text (sjl).
August 5, 2022 Filing 39 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(Coffin, Tristram)
August 4, 2022 Filing 38 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc. (Coffin, Tristram) Text modified on 8/4/2022 (pjl). Text modified on 8/8/2022 (eh).
July 28, 2022 Filing 37 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Kaylan Brown Coulter.(Jones, Eric)
July 25, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Stay filed by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coffin, Tristram)
July 15, 2022 Filing 35 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(Coffin, Tristram)
July 15, 2022 Filing 34 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Kaylan Brown Coulter.(Jones, Eric)
June 23, 2022 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Eric) Text modified on 6/23/2022 (esm).
June 22, 2022 Filing 32 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests to Produce, and Requests for Admission Propounded to Plaintiffs by Kaylan Brown Coulter.(Jones, Eric)
June 21, 2022 Filing 31 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq. (eh)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 3/1/2023. Motions due by 4/1/2023. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 4/1/2023 unless a timely filed motion for summary judgment is filed. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/21/2022. (esm)
June 21, 2022 Filing 29 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(O'Brien, Evan)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims; denying #27 MOTION for an Order Denying #15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims as moot. Defendant has 14 days (6/23/2022) to file a supplemental memo in support or Answer. Plaintiffs have 30 days to file a response, Defendant has 15 days to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/9/2022. (esm)
June 8, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims or, in the Alternative, MOTION for an Order Denying #15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims as moot filed by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coffin, Tristram) Text modified and motion event added on 6/8/2022 (esm).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on 15 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6). The court orders the parties to confer within 14 days on a joint discovery order. Plaintiffs shall file a proposed order within 14 days or request a discovery conference if the parties fail to agree. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/6/2022. (esm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaylan Brown Coulter filed by Cylance Inc., Blackberry Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service) (esm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on #15 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coffin, Tristram)
June 3, 2022 Filing 23 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(Coffin, Tristram)
June 3, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc. (Coffin, Tristram)
June 3, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tristram J. Coffin, Esq on behalf of Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(Coffin, Tristram)
June 3, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan J. O'Brien, Esq on behalf of Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc..(O'Brien, Evan)
May 20, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on #15 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric D. Jones, #2 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Eric) Link added, docket text and attachment text modified on 5/23/2022 (esm).
May 20, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew A. Zidovsky, Esq on behalf of Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zidovsky, Matthew) Attachment text modified on 5/20/2022 (esm).
May 20, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin G. Sherman, Esq on behalf of Kaylan Brown Coulter.(Sherman, Justin)
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims or Stay Proceeding filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Eric) Text modified on 5/16/2022 (esm).
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims or Stay Proceeding filed by Kaylan Brown Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Eric). Added MOTION to Stay and text modified on 5/16/2022 (esm). Modified on 5/16/2022 (esm).
May 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Kaylan Brown Coulter re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (originally filed 5/6/2022 in state court) (esm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Kaylan Brown Coulter waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (originally filed 4/12/2022 in state court) (esm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 12 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - First Set of Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Defendant Brown Coulter by Blackberry Corporation, Cylance Inc.. (originally filed 4/11/2022 in state court) (esm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against Kaylan Brown Coulter filed by Cylance Inc., Blackberry Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (originally filed 4/7/2022 in state court) (esm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Docket entries 4 - 8 removed from the docket due to incorrect case file from state court. (esm)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 Entry removed from the docket.
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 Entry removed from the docket.
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 Entry removed from the docket.
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 Entry removed from the docket.
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 Entry removed from the docket.
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Letter to Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division. The original document did not include the names of all of the attorneys. The letter has been corrected and is now attached to #2 and this entry. (esm)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division. (esm) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/6/2022) (esm).
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kaylan Brown Coulter from Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 22-CV-01249. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (esm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackberry Corporation et al v. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackberry Corporation
Represented By: Monica H. Allard, Esq.
Represented By: Tristram J. Coffin, Esq.
Represented By: William T. Clark, Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Rattigan, Esq.
Represented By: Evan J. O'Brien, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cylance Inc. doing business as Blackberry Cylance
Represented By: Monica H. Allard, Esq.
Represented By: Tristram J. Coffin, Esq.
Represented By: William T. Clark, Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Rattigan, Esq.
Represented By: Evan J. O'Brien, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaylan Brown Coulter
Represented By: Eric D. Jones, Esq.
Represented By: Justin G. Sherman, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew A. Zidovsky, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Coulter
Represented By: Richard T. Cassidy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Labs, Inc. doing business as Sentinelone doing business as Sentinelone.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?