Fenster v. QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.
Plaintiff: Trudy Fenster
Defendant: QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00017
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #4 Opposition to Motion, #2 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Defendant QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.. (Reinhardt, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Opposition to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Plaintiff Trudy Fenster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of March 6, 2019, #2 Exhibit Email of February 19, 2019, #3 Exhibit Email of March 4, 2019) (Fenster, Trudy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Defendant QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.. (Reinhardt, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by Defendant QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reinhardt, Matthew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Trudy Fenster Third Party Complaint from Superior Court - Division of St. Croix, case number SX-19-CV-72. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-788348)filed by QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Third Party Complaint Part 1, #3 Exhibit A1 - Third Party Complaint Part 2, #4 Exhibit A2 -Complaint Exhibits 1 to 10, #5 A3 -Complaint Exhibits 11 to 23, #6 A4 - Complaint Exhibits 24 to 39, #7 A5 - Complaint Exhibits 40 to 50) (Reinhardt, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenster v. QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Fenster
Represented By: Trudy Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.
Represented By: Matthew Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?