Lopez Cuevas v. Hunnell
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez Cuevas
Defendant: Douglas Scott Hunnell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00034
Filed: August 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Initial Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (GWC) dated 10/2/2019 (CONTINUED from 10/23/2019 at 11:00 AM (as set forth in #14 Order)) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/2/2019 granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for Leave to Allow Counsel to Participate in Status Conference Telephonically or in the alternative for a One-Week Adjournment of Status Conference (KMD)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically or, in the alternative, for a one-week adjournment of the scheduling conference by Defendant Douglas Scott Hunnell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Webster, Martial)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures by Douglas Scott Hunnell (Webster, Martial)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Jose Lopez Cuevas (Cattie, David)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/9/2019 granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (KMD)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/5/2019 Initial Disclosures due by 9/24/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019., Initial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Douglas Scott Hunnell. (Webster, Martial)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: SANFORD A. SCHULMAN(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-807476) by Defendant Douglas Scott Hunnell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Webster, Martial)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Martial A Webster on behalf of Defendant Douglas Scott Hunnell (Webster, Martial)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Douglas Scott Hunnell on 08/15/2019, filed by Jose Lopez Cuevas. (Cattie, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Lopez Cuevas. Douglas Scott Hunnell served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Cattie, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Douglas Scott Hunnell. (KAB)
August 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas Scott Hunnell ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-803163.)filed by Jose Lopez Cuevas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Douglas Scott Hunnell) (Cattie, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Cuevas v. Hunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Scott Hunnell
Represented By: Martial A Webster
Represented By: Sanford A Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez Cuevas
Represented By: David J. Cattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?