UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Thirteen Thousand Three Hundred and Two Dollars ($13,302.00) in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Thirteen Thousand Three Hundred and Two Dollars ($13,302.00) in United States Currency
Claimant: Troy Somme Jr and A-Shana Rasheeda Sackey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00042
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Reset Hearings (GWC) dated 10/22/2019 Initial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (as set forth in 9 Order) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/22/2019 UPON CONSIDERATION of #8 Motion to Continue, it is now hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted; and, it is further ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for December 12, 2019, is CONTINUED to Tuesday, December 17, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., in Magistrate Courtroom. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Scheduled for December 12, 2019 by Claimant A-Shana Rasheeda Sackey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Webster, Martial)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/22/2019 Initial Disclosures due by 11/12/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/10/2019., Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by A-Shana Rasheeda Sackey. (Webster, Martial)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Martial A Webster on behalf of Claimant A-Shana Rasheeda Sackey (Webster, Martial)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Process Receipt and Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Thirteen Thousand Three Hundred and Two Dollars ($13,302.00) in United States Currency served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. is in Marshals Service Possession. (TNS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest In Rem issued. (TNS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (Tyson-Floyd, Angela)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thirteen Thousand Three Hundred and Two Dollars ($13,302.00) in United States Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tyson-Floyd, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Thirteen Thousand Three Hundred and Two Dollars ($13,302.00) in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Troy Somme Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: A-Shana Rasheeda Sackey
Represented By: Martial A Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirteen Thousand Three Hundred and Two Dollars ($13,302.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Angela Tyson-Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?