Miller et al v. AARP Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Miller and Galen Swingen
Defendant: Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico, AARP, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc., Russell Ragsdale and AARP Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00049
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Sanabria on behalf of Defendants Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. (Sanabria, Victor)
November 26, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Lerner on behalf of Defendants Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. (Lerner, Joshua)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (MEM) dated 11/22/19granting #40 pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File oppos. re #23 MOTION to Dismiss. Opposition due by 12/23/2019. (Sempa, Barbe)
November 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Adjuster Defendants Sedgwick, Vericlaim and Russell Ragsdale's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Colon, Pamela)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (MEM) dated 11/19/19granting #38 pltf's Motion for an additional 90 days to serve deft. Overseas Ins. Agency. (Sempa, Barbe)
November 19, 2019 Filing 38 Emergency MOTION for Additional Time to Serve by Plaintiff Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Colon, Pamela)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER (MEM) dated 11/18/19granting #34 Karen Ellis Carr's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Sempa, Barbe)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (MEM) dated 11/18/19granting Emily Slavin's #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Sempa, Barbe)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (MEM) dated 11/18/19granting #31 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition to re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AARP. Opposition due due by 12/18/2019 Replies brief due by 1/9/2020. (Sempa, Barbe)
November 18, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Karen E. Carr(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-822243) by Defendants AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit B, Certificates of good standing, #3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Movant, #4 Exhibit D, Declaration of Simpson, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Simpson, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT re #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Emily Baver Slavin(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-822210) by AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Certificates of good standing, #2 Exhibit C, Declaration of Movant, #3 Exhibit D, Declaration of Simpson) (Simpson, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Emily Baver Slavin(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-822210) by Defendants AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Simpson, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Motion to Dismiss filed by AARP Defendants by Plaintiff Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Colon, Pamela)
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H. Hunter on behalf of Defendants Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. (Hunter, Richard)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico, Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
November 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. (Hunter, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL (GWC) dated 11/7/2019 US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon recused (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
November 4, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Refiling Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. re #23 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law) (Hunter, Richard)
November 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #24 Memorandum in Support to Motion. Document does not comply with Local Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 7.1 (d). (TNS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc.. (Hunter, Richard)
November 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc.. (Hunter, Richard)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc.. (Simpson, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Simpson, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE (WAL) dated 10/28/2019. Case reassigned to US District Judge Malachy E. Mannion for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Wilma A. Lewis no longer assigned to case(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (TLS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/23/2019 granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 11/12/2019. (KMD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico, Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico, Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugenio W.A. Geigel Simounet on behalf of Defendants Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico, Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/21/2019 granting #6 Motion for Admission of Joshua D. Lerner Pro Hac Vice (KMD)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/21/2019 granting #5 Motion for Admission of Victor Sanabria Pro Hac Vice (KMD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Consent to Removal by AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Consent to Removal by Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples and Cooperative de Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico) (Simpson, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hunter, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hunter, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vericlaim, Inc.. (Hunter, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hunter, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/9/2019 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Russel Ragsdale answer due 11/1/2019; Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. answer due 11/1/2019; Vericlaim, Inc. answer due 11/1/2019. (KMD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Russell Ragsdale, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Vericlaim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hunter, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Joshua D. Lerner(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-813210) by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Questionnaire, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Hunter, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Victor Sanabria(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-813205) by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Questionnaire, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Hunter, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AARP, Inc. for AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc... (Simpson, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H. Hunter on behalf of Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Hunter, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of negotiated extension of time to respond to complaint by AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc. (Simpson, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants AARP Services, Inc and AARP, Inc. from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-19-CV-477. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-812433)filed by AARP Services, Inc., AARP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court complaint, #2 Exhibit A to the Superior Court complaint, #3 Summons issued in the Superior Court, #4 Notices of filing served on AARP Inc. in the Superior Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Simpson, Andrew) Modified on 10/3/2019 (AM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. AARP Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Cooperativo Seguros Multiples
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel Simounet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Lerner
Represented By: Victor Sanabria
Represented By: Richard H. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel Simounet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARP, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vericlaim, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Lerner
Represented By: Richard H. Hunter
Represented By: Victor Sanabria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Ragsdale
Represented By: Joshua D Lerner
Represented By: Richard H. Hunter
Represented By: Victor Sanabria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARP Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Miller
Represented By: Pamela L Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galen Swingen
Represented By: Pamela L Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?