Bermudez v. Envoy Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marylin Bermudez
Defendant: Envoy Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00054
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER (GWC) dated 12/12/2019 Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2019., Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2020., Status Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon Jr., Status Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon Jr., Status Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Wilma A Lewis. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation by 3/31/2020. (KMD)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/12/2019. (Court Reporter FTR.) (TJ)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interrogatories by Nathan Mirocha (Mirocha, Nathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Joint Discovery Plan by Envoy Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Morgan, Micol)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Service of Rule 26 Disclosures by Nathan Mirocha for Plaintiff Marylin Bermudez (Mirocha, Nathan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Mirocha on behalf of Plaintiff Marylin Bermudez (Mirocha, Nathan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Mirocha on behalf of Plaintiff Marylin Bermudez (Mirocha, Nathan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures of Envoy Air, Inc. by Envoy Airlines, Inc. (Morgan, Micol)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/22/2019 Initial Disclosures due by 11/12/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/10/2019., Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Envoy Airlines, Inc.. (Morgan, Micol)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Envoy Airlines, Inc. from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands Division of St. Croix, case number SX-19-cv-000403. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-814629)filed by Envoy Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint) (Morgan, Micol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bermudez v. Envoy Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Micol L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylin Bermudez
Represented By: Nathan Mirocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?