UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Greene
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Ina Greene
Case Number: 1:2020cv00004
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (GWC) dated 3/23/2020 granting #3 Motion to Stay. Matter STAYED through 5/22/2020. Status report due by 5/20/2020. (KMD)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cole, Kimberly)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Ina Greene waiver sent on 2/3/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Cole, Kimberly)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ina Greene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cole, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ina Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?