United States of America V. Latoya Quinland a/k/a Latoya Quinland-Pemberton etal.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Latoya Quinland a/k/a Latoya Quinland-Pemberton, Chivonne JnLouis, Tiffany Quinalnd a/k/a Tiffany Quinland-Henry and Dujean Dawson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00015
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Chivonne JnLouis. (TNS)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to DuJean Dawson. (TNS)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt Re: #7 Order on Motion to Stay sent to Latoya Quinland-Pemberton. (TNS)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt Re: #7 Order on Motion to Stay received by Tiffany Quinland. (TNS)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (GWC) dated 3/23/2020 granting #6 Motion to Stay. Matter STAYED through 5/22/2020. Status report due by 5/20/2020. (KMD)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Cole, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tiffany Quinland on 2-27-20 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2020. (Cole, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to LaToya Quinland on 2-27-20 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2020. (Cole, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DuJean Dawson on 2-27-20 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2020. (Cole, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Chivonne JnLouis on 2-27-20 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Waiver of Service due by 3/28/2020. (Cole, Kimberly)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Unites States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cole, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America V. Latoya Quinland a/k/a Latoya Quinland-Pemberton etal.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Quinland a/k/a Latoya Quinland-Pemberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chivonne JnLouis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Quinalnd a/k/a Tiffany Quinland-Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dujean Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?