Johny v. Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenia Johny
Defendant: Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00022
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenia Johny. Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Greene, Ryan)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC. (TNS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-859932.)filed by Kenia Johny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Greene, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johny v. Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenia Johny
Represented By: Ryan W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?