Samuel, Edwards v. Aptim Evironmental and DSW HOMES, LLC , etal
Plaintiff: Edward Samuel
Defendant: Aptim Environmental, DSW HOMES, LLC, Infrastructure, Inc. and RR Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00028
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 41 RR Associates, LLC's ANSWER to #23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim by DSW Homes, LLC by RR Associates, LLC. (Crabill, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 40 RR Associates, LLC's ANSWER to #29 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc. by RR Associates, LLC. (Crabill, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 39 Defendant RR Associates, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint (Second) [DE 22] by RR Associates, LLC. (Crabill, William)
August 25, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Rule 26 Voluntary Disclosures by Edward Samuel (Attachments: #1 Bates ES000001-42, #2 Bates ES000043-81) (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interrogatories by Jennifer Sue Koockogey (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Demand for Production to RR Associates by Edward Samuel (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Interrogatories by Jennifer Sue Koockogey (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE Notice of Service of Demand for Production to DSW Homes by Edward Samuel (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #26 Request for Production of Documents, #24 Request for Production of Documents. Counsel was notified as to improper filing of certificate of service, and will re-file correctly. (TNS)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER (GWC) dated 8/18/2020 Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2021., Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2021., Status Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., Status Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., Status Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Wilma A. Lewis. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation by 4/1/2021. (KMD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/18/2020. (Court Reporter FTR Recorder.) (AM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 31 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Edward Samuel. (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 30 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Cross Claimants Aptim Environmental, Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc., Infrastructure, Inc., Defendants Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc.. (Beckstedt, Carl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 29 Defendant Aptim's ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against RR Associates, LLC by Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc.. (Beckstedt, Carl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 28 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant DSW HOMES, LLC, Cross Claimant DSW HOMES, LLC. (Capdeville, Douglas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interrogatories by Jennifer Sue Koockogey (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Edward Samuel. (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories to DSW Homes, LLC by Edward Samuel (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Edward Samuel. (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint (Second), CROSSCLAIM against RR Associates, LLC by DSW HOMES, LLC. (Capdeville, Douglas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants filed by Edward Samuel. (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/11/2020 granting #19 Stipulated Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint to Correctly Name the Parties (KMD)
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 Defendant RR Contracting, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by R&R Contracting, LLC. (Crabill, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Amend Complaint First Amended Complaint to Correctly Name the Parties by Plaintiff Edward Samuel. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit) (Koockogey, Jennifer)
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 RR Contracting, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by R&R Contracting, LLC. (Crabill, William)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/4/2020 Initial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Capdeville, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Self-Executing Disclosures by DSW HOMES, LLC (Capdeville, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Interrogatories: First Set, and Demand For Production of Documents to Plaintiff, Edward Samuel by DSW HOMES, LLC (Capdeville, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas L Capdeville on behalf of Defendant DSW HOMES, LLC, Cross Claimant DSW HOMES, LLC (Capdeville, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against R&R Contracting, LLC by DSW HOMES, LLC. (Capdeville, Douglas)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Aptim's ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against R&R Contracting, LLC by Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc.. (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William E Crabill on behalf of Defendant R&R Contracting, LLC (Crabill, William)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Consent to Removal by R&R Contracting, LLC (Crabill, William)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/22/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of #7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, it is now hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendant DSW HOMES, LLC, shall file and serve its Answer to the First Amended Complaint on or before July 29, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant DSW HOMES, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Capdeville, Douglas)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/21/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, it is now hereby ORDERED that the stipulated motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendant Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC, shall file and serve its responsive pleading(s) to the First Amended Complaint on or before July 27, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Motion for Extension of time for response to Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint by Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc. (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Aptim Environmental, Infrastructure, Inc. (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Sue Koockogey on behalf of Plaintiff Edward Samuel (Koockogey, Jennifer)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant DSW HOMES, LLC from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number SX-19-CV-155. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-871685)filed by DSW HOMES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Capdeville, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel, Edwards v. Aptim Evironmental and DSW HOMES, LLC , etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Samuel
Represented By: Lee J Rohn
Represented By: Jennifer Sue Koockogey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aptim Environmental
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSW HOMES, LLC
Represented By: Douglas L Capdeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infrastructure, Inc.
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RR Associates, LLC
Represented By: William E Crabill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?