Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 v. SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17
Defendant: SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00033
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rene Jean Gastelum on Wednesday, January 27, 2021 by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 15, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew D. Carlson on January 18, 2021 by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 15, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rene Jean Gastelum on January 27, 2021 by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 11, 2021 Filing 50 Subpoena Returned Executed - Andrew Carlson - 12/28/20 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 11, 2021 Filing 49 Subpoena Returned Executed - Rene Jean Gastelum - 12/23/20 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 8, 2021 Filing 48 Subpoena Returned Executed on December 18, 2020 Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
January 7, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew D. Carlson by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 7, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rene Jean Gastelum by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
January 5, 2021 Filing 45 Subpoena Returned Executed on December 21, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server - Tropitech) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
January 4, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Officer Melissa Vigilant by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
December 31, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Amended Subpoena by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 (Attachments: #1 Am Subpoena to Karden with Ex A) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
December 22, 2020 Filing 42 Subpoena Returned Executed on December 8, 2020 Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
December 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Deposition (amended) by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. of E. Thogerson Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Sanders, Daniel)
December 18, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Deposition by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. of E. Thogerson Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Sanders, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action - Ofc. Melissa Vigilant) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
December 16, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Tropitech Solutions) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
December 16, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Karden Construction Services) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
December 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to National Engineering) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
October 6, 2020 Filing 35 OATH OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION Pro Hac Vice for Barry Michael Clark. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (TNS)
October 6, 2020 Filing 34 OATH OF ADMISSION Pro Hac Vice for Stuart Sobel. AssociatedCases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (TNS)
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re (29 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 153 in 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC) Response, filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/14/2020. (Court Reporter FTR.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (TNS)
September 23, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Serving Second Supplemental Production by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Sobel, Stuart)
September 22, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Sobel, Stuart)
September 21, 2020 Filing 29 Response re (19 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Sunshine Mall's Counterclaim and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1 and 2, (20 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC) Memorandum in Support to Motion, filed by Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL, Counter Claimant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Mirocha, Nathan)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/18/2020 granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Reconsideration re 149 in 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, #26 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC) Scheduling Order; granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion for Reconsideration re 149 in 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, #26 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC) Scheduling Order Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (KMD)
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re (26 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 26 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 149 in 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 149 in 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC) Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Novak, Neal)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER (GWC) dated 9/14/2020 Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2020., Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2021., Status Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., Status Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., Status Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Wilma A. Lewis. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation by 3/31/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (KMD)
September 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY FILER NEEDS TO RE-FILE: DOCUMENT AND DOCKET TEXT DOES NOT MATCHRe: (25 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC) Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (CAB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Perrell, Charlotte)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/8/2020 denying 145 Motion to Authorize Virtual Swearing In of Stuart Sobel and Michael Clark at September 14, 2020[,] Initial Scheduling Teleconference in case 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC; denying #22 Motion to Authorize Virtual Swearing In of Stuart Sobel and Michael Clark at September 14, 2020[,] Initial Scheduling Teleconference in case 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (KMD)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Michael Clark on behalf of Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Clark, Barry Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic /Video for Oath by Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Draft Order) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Mirocha, Nathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Sobel on behalf of Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Sobel, Stuart)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Sunshine Mall's Counterclaim and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1 and 2 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. (Novak, Neal)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Sunshine Mall's Counterclaim and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1 and 2 by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Novak, Neal)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #13 Sunshine Mall's Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. (Novak, Neal)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/24/2020 granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Barry Michael Clark to the District Court of the Virgin Islands (KMD)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/24/2020 granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stuart Sobel to the District Court of the Virgin Islands (KMD)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/13/2020 Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020., Joint Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., via teleconference Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (KMD)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 Sunshine Shopping Center's ANSWER to (1 in 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC) Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Michael Clark(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-878294) by Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application, #2AFFIDAVIT, #3 Supplement Good Standing) (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Stuart Sobel(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-878291)( Responses due by 8/25/2020) by Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application, #2 AFFIDAVIT, #3 Supplement Good Standing) (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Mirocha on behalf of Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Mirocha on behalf of Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Mirocha on behalf of Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC, 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC (Mirocha, Nathan)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/31/2020 granting in part and denying in part 135 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Deadlines in case 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC; extending deadlines without date, until further order of the Court Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (KMD)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Supplemental Production by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Sobel, Stuart)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2020 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (KMD)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Supplemental Production by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (Sobel, Stuart)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/29/2020 Telephone Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00039-WAL-GWC, 1:20-cv-00033-WAL-GWC (KMD)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. (Novak, Neal)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-875012.)filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GP00647B17 Primary Full Slip, #2 Exhibit 2 - GP00647C17 XS Full Slip, #3 Exhibit 3 - POL 042619, #4 Exhibit 4 - Property Loss Notice (Uws), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons to Sunshine Mall) (Novak, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17 v. SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Represented By: Barry Michael Clark
Represented By: Nathan Mirocha
Represented By: Stuart Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Numbers B1230GP00647B17 and B1230GP00647C17
Represented By: Neal R. Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?