Scionti Construction Group LLC. vs. Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scionti Construction Group LLC
Defendant: Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00034
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scionti Construction Group LLC. Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc. waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Fenster, Trudy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc.. (TNS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, INC.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-876541.)filed by Scionti Construction Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, Inc.) (Fenster, Trudy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scionti Construction Group LLC. vs. Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scionti Construction Group LLC
Represented By: Trudy Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aptim Environmental and Infrastructure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?