Alexander et al v. STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST) et al
Plaintiff: Constance Alexander, Dinorah Williams and Petula Alexander
Defendant: CRC SCU, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST), Clarendon American Insurance Company and Deep South Surplus of Texas
Case Number: 1:2020cv00038
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance David S. Hendrix by Defendant CRC SCU (AM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Proof of Non-Service by Constance Alexander, Petula Alexander, Dinorah Williams Notice of Proof of Non-Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Koockogey, Jennifer)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Andrea Meza on behalf of Defendant CRC SCU (Meza, Veronica)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Sue Koockogey on behalf of Plaintiffs Constance Alexander, Petula Alexander, Dinorah Williams (Koockogey, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/14/2020 granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Hendrix, Esq. (KMD)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/14/2020 granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Veronica Andrea Meza, Esq. (KMD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: David Hendrix(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-883834) by Defendant CRC SCU. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit B: Certicates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of David Hendrix, #4 Exhibit D: Declaration of Robert Kuczynski, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kuczynski, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Veronica Meza(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-883826) by Defendant CRC SCU. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit B: Certifcate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Veroncia Meza, #4 Exhibit D: Declaration of Robert Kuczynski, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kuczynski, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (WAL) dated 09/08/2020. UPON CONSIDERATION of Plaintiffs' #7 "Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time," wherein Plaintiffs request a 30-day extension up to and including October 15, 2020 to file their response to Defendant CRC SCU's #3 "Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to Texas," it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including October 15, 2020 to file their response to Defendant CRC SCU's Motion to Dismiss. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (MKG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue to Texas by Plaintiffs Constance Alexander, Petula Alexander, Dinorah Williams. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Rohn, Lee)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST). (Wilczynski, Mark)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST). (Wilczynski, Mark)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue to Texas filed by Defendant CRC SCU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Neil Kessler, #2 Exhibit B: Summons and Complaint) (Kuczynski, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue to Texas by Defendant CRC SCU. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kuczynski, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendant CRC SCU (Kuczynski, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Constance Alexander, Petula Alexander, Dinorah Williams from Superior Court Division of St. Croix, case number SX-20-CV-0609. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-878298)filed by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Deep South Corp Satus, #5 Exhibit Def Clarendon Statement of Consent for Removal, #6 Exhibit Def CRC SCU Statement of Consent for Removal) (Wilczynski, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Alexander
Represented By: Jennifer Sue Koockogey
Represented By: Lee J Rohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinorah Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Sue Koockogey
Represented By: Lee J Rohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petula Alexander
Represented By: Jennifer Sue Koockogey
Represented By: Lee J Rohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC SCU
Represented By: Veronica Andrea Meza
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (STEADFAST)
Represented By: Mark Wilczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon American Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep South Surplus of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?