George v. Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Cyrille George
Defendant: Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00074
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Requesting Leave to Attend Scheduling Conference Telephonically by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Joint Discovery and Scheduling Plan by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Rule 26 Voluntary Disclosures by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Cyrille George (Dowling, Renee)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #5 Opposition to Motion For Remand filed by Plaintiff Cyrille George. (Dowling, Renee)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Opposition to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Cyrille George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Dowling, Renee)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/14/2020 Initial Disclosures due by 10/5/2020., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2020., Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (Geigel Simounet, Eugenio)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Cyrille George from Superior Court Division of St. Croix, case number SX-20-CV-315. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AVIDC-882330) filed by Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons) (AM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Wire Products, Inc
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel Simounet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Cyrille George
Represented By: Renee D Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?