Shirley et al v. Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Helen Shirley, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, and all others similarly situated, Virginie George, John Sonson, Isidore Jules and Anisha Hendricks
Defendant: Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC and Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00259
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE to the Court Re: Continuation of Stay of Virgin Islands Class Action Suits by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Richard Yelton on behalf of Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated (Yelton, Harry)
July 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7-15-21, before Judge Wilma A. Lewis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindsay DeWaide, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 340-712-7112. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2021. (Dewaide, Lindsay)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie S. Carter on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Carter, Melanie)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE Notice to Court Re: 14 Day Stay by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #7 MOTION Leave to Engage in Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery , #8 Reply to Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated. (Gower, Charles)
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 Response re #7 MOTION Leave to Engage in Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (WAL) dated 07/16/2021 SUMMARIZING the issues addressed at the July 15, 2021 oral argument in this matter; EMBODYING the Court's rulings to date; DISCUSSING the current status of the proceedings; MEMORIALIZING the upcoming deadlines. (MFR)
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilma A. Lewis: Omnibus Hearing held on 7/15/2021.(Court Reporter Lindsay Dewaide.) (Benjamin, Jessica).
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Bankruptcy Petition) (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #10 for Melanie S. Carter. (TNS) (TNS).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/12/2021 granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melanie S. Carter, Esq. (KMD)
July 12, 2021 Terminate Hearing, Duplicate Docket. (TNS)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (WAL) dated 07/09/2021 SCHEDULING an oral argument on both [1-5] "Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Limetree's Communications with Putative Class Members" in the instant matter and "Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Mandatory Injunction, and to Limit Communications with Class Members [and] Void Releases Signed by Class Members" filed in Cotton v. Limetree (2021-cv-0261) for July 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in STX Courtroom 1 before District Judge Wilma A. Lewis. (MFR)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #5 Response, [Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order] filed by Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nelson, Korey)
July 9, 2021 (WAL) dated 07/09/2021 SCHEDULING an oral argument on both [1-5] "Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Limetree's Communications with Putative Class Members" in the instant matter and "Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Mandatory Injunction, and to Limit Communications with Class Members [and] Void Releases Signed by Class Members" filed in Cotton v. Limetree (2021-cv-0261) for July 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in STX Courtroom 1 before District Judge Wilma A. Lewis. (MFR)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION Leave to Engage in Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery by Plaintiffs Josie Barnes, Rosalba Estevez, Virginie George, Anisha Hendricks, Isidore Jules, Arleen Miller, Cristel Rodriguez, Helen Shirley, John Sonson, and all others similarly situated. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gower, Charles)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Melanie S. Carter(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-942683) by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Response re #3 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Limetree's Communications with Putative Class Members filed by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (Beckstedt, Carl)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Kuczynski, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Exhibit by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E (Amended), #2 Exhibit Q (Amended)) (Beckstedt, Carl)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-2021-CV-00411. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942353)filed by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirley et al v. Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Shirley
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arleen Miller
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristel Rodriguez
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Barnes
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalba Estevez
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: and all others similarly situated
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginie George
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sonson
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidore Jules
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anisha Hendricks
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Represented By: Vincent A. Colianni, II
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Harry Richard Yelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Refining, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?