Charles et al v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Francis E. Charles and Theresa J Charles
Defendant: EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC, Freepoint Commodities, LLC, Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC and Limetree Bay Refining, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00260
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Kanaan Le'Roy Wilhite on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Wilhite, Kanaan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE to the Court Re: Continuation of Stay of Virgin Islands Class Action Suits by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/9/2021 denying #45 Defendant EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (KMD)
August 9, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Defendant EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marinelli, Adam)
July 28, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Justin Herskowitz on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Herskowitz, Arthur)
July 28, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Healy on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Healy, Francis)
July 28, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin Brosterman on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Brosterman, Melvin)
July 26, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE Re: 14 Day Stay by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 23, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL GROUNDS FOR REMOVAL by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 21, 2021 Filing 39 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #25 for Melvin A. Brosterman. (TNS)
July 21, 2021 Filing 38 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #26 for Francis C. Healy, Esquire. (TNS)
July 21, 2021 Filing 37 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #27 for Arthur J. Herskowitz, Esquire. (TNS).
July 19, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Trogdon on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Trogdon, Holly)
July 19, 2021 Filing 35 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #21 for Holly R. Trogdon, esq. (TNS)
July 15, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Avery on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Avery, Xavier)
July 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Owen on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Owen, Matthew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Donovan on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Donovan, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #3 Notice of Appearance. login and signatures don't match counsel needs to re-file correctly. (TNS)
July 15, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #28 Notice of Appearance, #29 Notice of Appearance, #30 Notice of Appearance. Signature and Log in don't match, counsel needs to re-file correctly. (TNS)
July 14, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Bankruptcy Petition) (Beckstedt, Carl)
July 14, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
July 14, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
July 14, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/13/2021 granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur J. Herskowitz (KMD)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/13/2021 granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis C. Healy (KMD)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/13/2021 granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melvin A. Brosterman (KMD)
July 12, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Arthur J. Herskowitz(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-945105) by Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Exhibit COGS, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Francis C. Healy(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-945104) by Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Exhibit COGS, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Melvin A. Brosterman(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-945103) by Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Exhibit COGS, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/12/2021 granting #16 Defendant ArcLight Capital Partners, LLC's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Holly Trogdon (KMD)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #14 for Xavier J. Avery. (TNS)
July 9, 2021 Filing 19 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #13 for Matthew S. Owen. (TNS)
July 9, 2021 Filing 18 OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #12 for Daniel T. Donovan (TNS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Arclight's 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
July 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Holly Trogdon(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-944111) by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Application, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of CEL, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Lockwood, Charles)
July 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #11 Notice (Other). Event and PDF don't match counsel needs to re-file correctly. (TNS)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/6/2021 granting in part and denying in part #7 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Time extended through 8/9/2021. (KMD)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/6/2021granting #10 Defendant ArcLight Capital Partners, LLC's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Xavier J. Avery (KMD)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/6/2021 granting #9 Defendant ArcLight Capital Partners, LLC's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S. Owen (KMD)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/6/2021granting #8 Defendant ArcLight Capital Partners, LLC's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel T. Donovan, P.C.[sic] (KMD)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE ArcLight's Disclosure Statement by Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Xavier Avery(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-943661) by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Application, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of CEL, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Lockwood, Charles)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Mathew Owen(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-943659) by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Application, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of CEL, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Lockwood, Charles)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Daniel Donovan(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-943654) by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Application, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of CEL, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Lockwood, Charles)
July 1, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #3 Notice of Appearance.Counsel needs to re-file using correct log in information, docket #3 was filed by Charles Lockwood, Esq, and attached document signed by Gregg Kronenberger, Esq. (TNS)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kronenberger, Gregg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Dema on behalf of Plaintiffs Francis E. Charles, Theresa J Charles (Dema, John)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Kuczynski, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Francis E. Charles, Theresa J Charles from VI Superior Court, St Croix Division, case number SX-2021-CV-00413. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942364)filed by Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to removal, #3 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Notice of Service, #5 Exhibit Ex C - Notices of Appearance, #6 Exhibit Ex D - Other docket entries) (Kronenberger, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles et al v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Marinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freepoint Commodities, LLC
Represented By: J. Daryl Dodson
Represented By: Arthur Justin Herskowitz
Represented By: Francis Healy
Represented By: Kanaan Le'Roy Wilhite
Represented By: Melvin Brosterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC
Represented By: Gregg R Kronenberger
Represented By: Charles Edward Lockwood
Represented By: Daniel T. Donovan
Represented By: Holly Trogdon
Represented By: Matthew Owen
Represented By: Xavier J Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Refining, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis E. Charles
Represented By: John K Dema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa J Charles
Represented By: John K Dema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?