USA v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, West Indies Petroleum Limited, Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP and Transition Refinery Entity LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00264
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Emile A Henderson
2 Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/12/2023 denying #26 Motion for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Substitute Party. (RDB)
December 22, 2022 Filing 38 OATH OF ADMISSION (EAH) for Corinne V. Snow, Esquire. Related Document: #34 (TNS)
December 22, 2022 Filing 37 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #32 Opposition to Motion filed by Defendants Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP, West Indies Petroleum Limited. (Simpson, Andrew)
December 22, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of filing by Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl)
December 22, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of filing by Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER (EAH) dated 12/22/2022 granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corinne V. Snow, Esq.). (GMF)
December 21, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #30 Opposition to Motion filed by Defendants Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP, West Indies Petroleum Limited. (Simpson, Andrew)
December 15, 2022 Filing 32 Opposition to Motion re #26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Flint, Myles)
December 15, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing Re: Texas Certificates of Good Standing for Attorney Snow by Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC re #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Corinne V. Snow(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1038381) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Beckstedt, Carl)
December 14, 2022 Filing 30 Opposition to Motion re #26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, filed by Defendant Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC. (Beckstedt, Carl)
December 5, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Corinne V. Snow(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1038381) by Defendant Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
December 2, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl)
December 1, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, filed by Defendants Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP, West Indies Petroleum Limited. (Simpson, Andrew)
December 1, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, by Defendants Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP, West Indies Petroleum Limited. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Simpson, Andrew)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (EAH) dated 11/17/2022 granting #23 Motion to Substitute Party. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC terminated. West Indies Petroleum, Limited; Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation LLLP; and the Transition Refinery Entity, LLC are substituted as Defendants in the place of Defendant Limetree Bay Refining, LLC. (RDB)
November 16, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Substitute Party United States Motion, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c), for an Order Substituting West Indies Petroleum Limited, Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP, and the Transition Refinery Entity, LLC for Defendant Lime tree Bay Refining, LLC filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Flint Declaration Part 1 of 4, #2 Flint Declaration Part 2 of 4, #3 Flint Declaration Part 3 of 4, #4 Flint Declaration Part 4 of 4) (Flint, Myles)
November 15, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Party United States Motion, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c), for an Order Substituting West Indies Petroleum Limited, Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP, and the Transition Refinery Entity, LLC for Defendant Limetree Bay Refining, LLC by Plaintiff United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
November 1, 2022 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Sixth Joint Status Report by United States of America. (Flint, Myles)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (EAH) dated 8/26/2022 granting #20 Motion to Extend Stay up to and including December 1, 2022. The parties shall file a joint status report wit the Court no later than November 1, 2022. (RDB)
August 22, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Proceedings Except for the United States' Expected Motion Under Rule 25 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Plaintiff United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
July 27, 2022 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Fifth Joint Status Report by United States of America. (Flint, Myles)
July 25, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #18 Status Report. Filer, please see LRCi 5.4(h)(3) regarding the electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party and please refile the document. (IW)
July 22, 2022 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Fifth Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (EAH) dated 5/26/22 granting #16 parties Fourth Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines. Case STAYED until 8/22/22. Joint status report due 7/22/22. (GPG)
May 23, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RAM) REASSIGNING CASE dated 5/2/2022. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (AM)
April 20, 2022 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Fourth Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (GWC) dated 2/18/2022 granting #12 Third Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; extending stay through 5/20/2022; ordering status report by 4/20/2022 (KMD)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (GWC) dated 12/10/2021 granting #9 Second Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; staying all deadlines and proceedings through 2/21/2022; ordering a joint status report by 1/21/2022 (KMD)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING STAY (GWC) dated 9/10/2021 granting #6 Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; extending stay through 12/10/2021. Status report due by 11/12/2021. (KMD)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/26/2021 granting #3 Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines. Matter is STAYED through 10/11/2021. Joint status report due by 9/10/2021. (KMD)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay all deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Flint, Myles)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flint, Myles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Myles E Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Indies Petroleum Limited
Represented By: Andrew C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation, LLLP
Represented By: Andrew C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transition Refinery Entity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?