Schuster v. Philip Morris USA Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Schuster
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.,, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Topa Equities VI Corporation, Culusvi, Inc. D/B/A Cost-U-Less, United Corporation d/b/a Plaza Extra East and KAC357, Inc. d/b/a Plaza Extra West
Case Number: 1:2021cv00269
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Unopposed of Attorney: Michael A. Alvarez(paid $250 PHV fee) by Plaintiff Carlos Schuster. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pate, John-Russell)
October 23, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Carlos Schuster. (Pate, John-Russell)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/14/2021 granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline M. Pasek (KMD)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jacqueline M. Pasek(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-962134) by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jacqueline M. Pasek, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carlos Schuster by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Messier, Chad)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN Opposition to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Notice of Compliance and Request for Clarification) (Messier, Chad)
October 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carlos Schuster by Plaintiff Carlos Schuster. (Pate, John-Russell)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Negotiated Enlargement of Time Pursuant to LRCi 6.1(b)(7) by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Messier, Chad)
September 19, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Carlos Schuster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Extension of Time Stip., #2 Exhibit Court Order to File Answers, #3 Exhibit Master Case Consolidation Order, #4 Exhibit Scheduling Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Pate, John-Russell)
September 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Carlos Schuster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pate, John-Russell)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Certain Claims (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay merits motions until after jurisdictional remand motion by Plaintiff Carlos Schuster. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pate, John-Russell)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Certain Claims filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Messier, Chad)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Certain Claims by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Messier, Chad)
September 1, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: A proposed order was not filed as an attachment to the motion. Filer is advised to file a proposed order using the event Notice (Other) referencing Notice of Filing as the docket text. The propose order will be an attachment to the notice and the document should be linked to the motion.Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Certain Claims. (W, K)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Rames on behalf of Defendant Philip Morris USA Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Consent to Removal, #2 Exhibit Philip Morris USA, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement oi) (Rames, Kevin)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds American Inc., Corporate Parent British American Tobacco, p.l.c. for R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company.. (Messier, Chad)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad C. Messier on behalf of Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company (Messier, Chad)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-2020-CV-00721. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-952640)filed by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of West Indies Co. and Bellows, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Dismissal of World Fresh Market, #5 Exhibit D - Order Granting Consent Motion to Dismiss Liggett, #6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses (Redacted), #7 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Supplemental Interrogatory Responses (Redacted), #8 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Composite Medical Records (Redacted), #9 Exhibit H - CULUSVI Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement, #10 Exhibit I-1 - Process, #11 Exhibit I-2 - Pleadings, #12 Exhibit I-3 - Orders) (Messier, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuster v. Philip Morris USA Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Schuster
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.,
Represented By: Kevin A Rames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Chad C. Messier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topa Equities VI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culusvi, Inc. D/B/A Cost-U-Less
Represented By: Kyle R. Waldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Corporation d/b/a Plaza Extra East
Represented By: Chad C. Messier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAC357, Inc. d/b/a Plaza Extra West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?