Pedro v. Paragon Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elvis Pedro
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00043
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Juan R Sanchez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM (JRS) dated 9/1/2022. (LDM)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (JRS) dated 9/1/2022 denying #5 Motion to Dismiss. (LDM)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER:(EAH) dated 8/31/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2023 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 2 before US District Judge Juan R Sanchez. Status Conference set for 3/10/2023 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III. Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2023. Motions due by 6/16/2023. (TNS)
August 30, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #15 Opposition to Motion [Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss] filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Bentz, Karin)
August 23, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/23/2022. (Court Reporter FTR RECORDER.) (JB)
August 23, 2022 Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER (EAH) dated 8/23/2022 APPROVING parties' #23 Stipulation for Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. (RDB)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (EAH) dated 8/23/2022 granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 8/30/2022. (RDB)
August 23, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION [Stipulation for Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order] by Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bentz, Karin)
August 23, 2022 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order) (Rohn, Lee)
August 22, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension of Time] by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bentz, Karin)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (EAH) dated 8/22/2022 denying #8 Motion to Stay. (TNS)
August 19, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #16 Opposition to Motion, [Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss] filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Bentz, Karin)
August 17, 2022 Filing 18 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Bentz, Karin)
August 17, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #14 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Voluntary Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26. Filer used an erroneous case number in the case caption. (IW)
August 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Paragon Systems, Inc. (Bentz, Karin)
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 Opposition to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay [Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss] filed by Plaintiff Elvis Pedro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Rohn, Lee)
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 Opposition to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Elvis Pedro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Rohn, Lee)
August 16, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Voluntary Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 by Elvis Pedro (Rohn, Lee)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (EAH) dated 8/12/22 granting #12 Defendant's unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically or via Microsoft Teams at the scheduling conference set for 8/23/22. The Clerk of Court shall provide the link. (GPG)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION To Appear Telephonically or Via Microsoft Teams by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bentz, Karin)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (EAH) dated 8/10/22 granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension of Time. Plaintiff's responses to #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and #8 Defendant's Motion to Stay are due no later than 8/16/22. (GPG)
August 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Stay [Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss], #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Elvis Pedro. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Rohn, Lee)
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Elvis Pedro. (Rohn, Lee)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay [Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss] by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bentz, Karin)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paragon Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. for Paragon Systems, Inc... (Bentz, Karin)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bentz, Karin)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bentz, Karin)
July 22, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), Paragon Systems, Inc. is required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (IW)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (EAH) dated 7/21/22. Initial Conference set for 8/23/2022 01:00 PM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III. (GPG)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE (RAM) dated 7/14/2022. This Case is reassigned to the Honorable Judge Juan R. Sanchez for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Wilma A. Lewis is no longer assigned to this case. (This is a TEXT-ONLY entry. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMS)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER OF RECUSAL (WAL) dated 07/14/2022. It is hereby ORDERED that District Judge Wilma A. Lewis is recused from all further proceedings in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ERT)
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Bentz, Karin)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc. from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands District of St. Croix, case number SX-2022-CV-00137. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1012490)filed by Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Bentz, Karin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedro v. Paragon Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Pedro
Represented By: Lee J Rohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Karin A. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?