Davis v. Potter
Plaintiff: Charlotte P. Davis and Charlotte Poole Davis
Defendant: Osbert Potter, Trengenza Roach, Albert Bryan, Jr. and Government of the Virgin Islands
Case Number: 1:2022cv00062
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte P. Davis. Trengenza Roach served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (JC)
December 19, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte P. Davis. Osbert Potter served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (JC)
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Poole Davis. Government of the Virgin Islands served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (JC)
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte P. Davis. Albert Bryan, Jr. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (JC)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charlotte P. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (TNS)
December 6, 2022 Filing fee: Paid $ 402.00, receipt number 145.in re: #1 Complaint and #9 ORDER. (TNS)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 HARD COPY NOTICE of filing Invoice as to payment needed for IFP, Related Document: #9 sent to Charlotte P. Davis, Pro- Se P.O. Box 25945 Sunny Isles, VI 00824, via certified mail and return receipt. (TNS)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (EAH) dated 12/5/2022 denying re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charlotte P. Davis, Charlotte Poole Davis, and denying #6 MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charlotte P. Davis, Plaintiff shall pay the requisite filing fee within 14 days from the date of this Order. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to amend within an appropriate time frame ordered by the District Court.( Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2022) (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Charlotte P. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charlotte P. Davis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Government of the Virgin Islands/ CO Albert Bryan, Jr. (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Albert Bryan, Jr., Governor of the Virgin Island. (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Osbert Potter. (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trengenza Roach. (TNS)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants LODGED pending disposition of motion to proceed in forma pauperis. filed by Charlotte P. Davis. Complaint filed on (12/2/2022) filing fee paid as leave to proceed in forma pauperis was denied.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (TNS) #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (TNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Poole Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osbert Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trengenza Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bryan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of the Virgin Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?