Coates v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Millentine Coates
Defendant: XYZ Corporation and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00035
Filed: June 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Michigan. File transferred via CM/ECF Interdistrict Transfer. (TRH)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER (RAM) The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this matter to the Eastern District of Michigan. Ford Motor Company's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, ECF #25 , is MOOT. (CAA)
May 14, 2020 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION (RAM) (CAA)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (WAL) REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert A. Molloy for all further proceedings. District Judge Curtis V. Gomez no longer assigned to case. dated 4/27/2020 (MA)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER (CVG) Ford's motions to dismiss, ECF #5 and ECF #6 , are MOOT. (CAA)
March 13, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Service of Its Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
March 11, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (RM): With the exception of any supplementation of request for production 2, the motion to compel #56 is DENIED. (AO)
February 11, 2019 Filing 57 Opposition to Motion re #56 MOTION to Compel Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion To Compel filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Neil, Paul)
February 3, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (King, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories from Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
January 30, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories from Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
January 29, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller:: Telephone status Conference held on 1/29/2019. (TRH) Modified on 1/29/2019 (TRH).
January 28, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Service of Verification of Its Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Jurisdictional Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
January 18, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories from Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
January 9, 2019 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 1/9/2019. (TRH)
January 9, 2019 Filing 49 Minute Order (RM). Proceedings held in chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 1/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
January 4, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of service of jurisdictional interrogatories and requests for production of documents by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Certificate of Service not signed. Please Re-file Re: #47 Notice (Other). (KAB)
December 19, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF JURISDICTION INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl C Barnes on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Barnes, Daryl)
October 30, 2018 Filing 45 Opposition to Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE to the Court of Change of Physical Address by Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (CVG) dated 10/25/18 #18 that the motion is GRANTED and Jessica M. Kennedy Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court in person to take the oath when she is next in this jurisdiction. (CAB)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (CVG) dated 10/25/18 #28 that the motion is GRANTED and Courtney M. King, Esquire is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court in person to take the oath when she is next in this jurisdiction (CAB)
October 23, 2018 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/23/2018. (KAB)
October 23, 2018 Filing 40 Minute Order (RM). Proceedings held in chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/23/2018. Status Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 39 OATH OF ADMISSION of Scott Richman, Esquire Related Document: #35 (CAB)
October 22, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Joint Discovery Plan by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Exhibit A) (Barnes, Daryl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 37 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 36 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Barnes, Daryl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Curtis V. Gomez: Attorney Oath of Admission Hearing held on 10/22/2018. (Court Reporter Persha Warner.) (CAB)
October 22, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance of Scott Richman Pro Hac Vice by Ford Motor Company (Barnes, Daryl)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER (RM) granting Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone #29 . Counsel shall call the Magistrate Judge's Chambers (340-774-5480) at the scheduled time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 32 Response re #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear TELEPHONICALLY filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Barnes, Daryl)
October 21, 2018 Filing 31 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
October 21, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of service of initial disclosures by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear TELEPHONICALLY by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Courtney M. King(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-750706) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
October 19, 2018 Set Hearings: Attorney Pro Hac Vice Admission Hearing set for 10/22/2018 11:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before District Judge Curtis V. Gomez. (CAB)
October 16, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Ford's Initial Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Barnes, Daryl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B) (Barnes, Daryl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Neil, Paul)
September 25, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Neil, Paul)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Neil, Paul)
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Neil on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Neil, Paul)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Millentine Coatesfiled by Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jessica M. Kennedy(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-744624) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (CVG) dated 9/11/18granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Scott A. Richman, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court in person to take the oath when he is next in this jurisdiction. (CAB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Scott A. Richman(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-741181) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RM) granting Motion to Amend Complaint #10 . (AO)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by Millentine Coates re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Relined amended complaint) (King, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (RM): In connection with plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint [ECF 11], on or before September 7, 2018, plaintiff shall file a red-line version of the proposed amended complaint, to comply with Local Rule 15.1. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 Opposition to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (RM) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 8/24/2018(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Memorandum in Support to Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
June 28, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Barnes, Daryl)
June 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
June 28, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY FILER INFORMED THAT SELECTED EVENT AND DOCUMENT HEADING SHOULD BE THE SAME; FILER INSTRUCTED TO FILE MEMORANDUM AS A SEPERATED DOCKET ENTERY Re: #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (TRH)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ( Responses due by 7/20/2018), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 7/12/2018) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Barnes, Daryl)
June 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to File Defendant Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ford Motor Company (Barnes, Daryl)
June 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit C to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Removal by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) (Barnes, Daryl)
June 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barnes, Daryl)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Ford Motor Company from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, Division of St. Thomas/St. John, case number ST-18-CV-140. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-727693)filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Barnes, Daryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millentine Coates
Represented By: Robert L. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Represented By: Jessica M. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Daryl C Barnes
Represented By: Courtney M. King
Represented By: Paul R. Neil
Represented By: Scott A. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?