DUKES et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JULIE E DUKES and Mr MARTIN W DUKES
Defendant: Xyz Corporation, Inc, Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC. and Abc Co. A Fictitious Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00064
Filed: September 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (RM) granting #8 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to the complaint. Responses are due by 11/8/2018.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Defendants Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reinhardt, Matthew)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (RM) granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC answer due 10/29/2018; Fay Servicing, LLC. answer due 10/29/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reinhardt, Matthew)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Reinhardt on behalf of Defendants Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC. (Reinhardt, Matthew)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons issued (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fay Servicing, LLC.. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC. (KAB)
September 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-741762.)filed by MARTIN W DUKES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS) (King, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUKES et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE E DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr MARTIN W DUKES
Represented By: Robert L. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xyz Corporation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC.
Represented By: Matthew Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abc Co. A Fictitious Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?