Halliday v. Great Lakes Insurance SE et al
Plaintiff: Bruce S. Halliday
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE, Concept Special Risks, Ltd. and Wager & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00072
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Curtis V Gomez
2 Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr.: Status Conference held on 2/3/2020. The next status conference is set for 4/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon Jr. (KMD)
January 30, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Consent of Plaintiff to Consolidation of Case with Case No. 3:19-cv-00063-CVG-RM by Bruce S. Halliday (Goldman, Neil)
January 13, 2020 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr.: Status Conference held on 1/10/2020. Next Status Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon Jr. (KMD)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER (GWC) dated 12/19/2019 rescheduling status conference. Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 2:00 PM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller, Ron deLugo Federal Building, St. Thomas, VI, before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon Jr. (KMD)
November 16, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to the revised Second Amended Complaint re #67 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wager & Associates, Inc.. (Moskowitz, Alex) Modified on 12/5/2019 (KAB).
November 16, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to the revised Second Amended Complaint re #67 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Concept Special Risks, Ltd.. (Moskowitz, Alex) Modified on 12/5/2019 (KAB).
November 15, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint Revised Second Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant Bruce S. Halliday Bruce S. Halliday by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Application, #2 Exhibit B- Master Policy) (Moskowitz, Alex)
September 27, 2019 Filing 68 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (GWC) dated 9/27/2019 Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018., Discovery due by 12/31/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 6/19/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2020., Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., Status Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr.; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation by 1/31/2020; TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 at 9:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
September 23, 2019 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Revised Second Amended Complaint) against Bruce S. Hallidayfiled by Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I) (Goldman, Neil)
September 20, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Filing Revised Joint Discovery Schedule by Concept Special Risks, Ltd., Great Lakes Insurance SE, Wager & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Revised Joint Discovery Schedule) (Moskowitz, Alex)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/11/2019 directing Plaintiff to file his Second Amended Complaint (KMD)
September 11, 2019 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr.: Status Conference held on 9/11/2019 (KMD)
September 10, 2019 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 12:00 PM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon. (AM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 12:00 PM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon. (AM)
September 10, 2019 Status Conference scheduled for 9/11/19 @ 12:00 pm before Judge Ruth Miller is cancelled dated 9/10/19(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AM)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER (GWC) dated 09/10/2019 setting Status Conference for Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Judge Cannon's Chambers (MAB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by Great Lakes Insurance SE (Moskowitz, Alex)
August 16, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Concept Special Risks Ltd. Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Concept Special Risks, Ltd. (Moskowitz, Alex)
August 16, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Wager & Associates Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents by Wager & Associates, Inc. (Moskowitz, Alex)
August 16, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Great Lakes Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Great Lakes Insurance SE (Moskowitz, Alex)
August 1, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION (GWC) dated 08/01/2019 re #41 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and #23 Wager's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (MAB)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER (GWC) dated 08/01/2019 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #41 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and DENYING as MOOT #23 Wager's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (MAB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 55 SUPPLEMENT re #46 Reply to Opposition to Motion, and Order (Doc 53) by Bruce S. Halliday. (Goldman, Neil)
July 24, 2019 Filing 54 Response re #53 Order of July 15, 2019 filed by Defendant Wager & Associates, Inc.. (Moskowitz, Alex)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/15/2019 directing the parties to submit supplemental briefs re #41 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by 7/24/2019 (MAB)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER OF RECUSAL. (RM) Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller recused. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon for all further proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (SP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery Documents by Bruce S. Halliday (Goldman, Neil)
June 21, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's First Request for Admissions to Plaintiff by Great Lakes Insurance SE (Moskowitz, Alex)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER (RM): Hearing on motion to amend and Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/10/2019. Next Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 12:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO)
June 10, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 6/10/2019. (TRH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Omnibus Hearing held on 6/10/2019. (Court Reporter FTR GOLD RECORDER.) (TRH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #42 Notice (Other), (Reply to Defendant Wager and Associates Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend) filed by Counter Defendant Bruce S. Halliday, Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Goldman, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (RM) finding as moot #43 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (RM): Status Conference previously set for 5/24/2019 is CONTINUED for 6/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in STT Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Oral Argument on Motion to Amend Complaint set for 6/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in STT Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Appear By Telephone by Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Goldman, Neil)
May 15, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing Defendant Wager & Associates, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Revised Proposed Second Amended Complaint by Wager & Associates, Inc. re #41 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opposition to Plaintiff's Revised Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Moskowitz, Alex)
April 22, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Revised Proposed Second Amended Complaint by Bruce S. Halliday re #40 Order on Motion to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Redline Revised Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Clean Revised Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Goldman, Neil)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (RM) denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint #31 . To the extent he wishes to do so, plaintiff may seek to file a revised proposed second amended complaint on or before April 22, 2019. (AO)
March 14, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #34 Opposition to Motion, For Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Goldman, Neil)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (CVG)referring case to Magistrate Judge. (KAB)
March 11, 2019 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 3/11/2019. (TRH)
March 11, 2019 Filing 36 Minute Order (RM). Proceedings held in chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 3/11/2019. Next Status Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
March 8, 2019 Filing 35 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Bruce S. Halliday. (Goldman, Neil)
February 28, 2019 Filing 34 Opposition to Motion re #31 MOTION to Amend Complaint #7 Amended Complaint, #29 Pretrial Conference - Interim, Set Hearings filed by Defendant Wager & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Insurance Policy) (Moskowitz, Alex)
February 20, 2019 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/11/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (TRH)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER (RM): the parties' stipulation #32 for extension of time to respond to the motion to amend is not approved. Defendants shall respond to the motion no later than March 1, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Concept Special Risks, Ltd., Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moskowitz, Alex)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Brief in support is a separate entry. Please Re-file. Re: #31 MOTION to Amend Complaint #7 Amended Complaint, #29 Pretrial Conference - Interim, Set Hearings . (KAB)
January 28, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Amend Complaint #7 Amended Complaint, #29 Pretrial Conference - Interim, Set Hearings by Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Goldman, Neil)
January 7, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 1/7/2019. (Court Reporter FTR.) (KAB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Order (RM). Proceedings held in chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/7/2019. Status Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (RM): Status Conference previously set for 10:00 AM on 1/7/2019 is RESCHEDULED for 02:00 PM on 1/7/2019 in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
December 21, 2018 Filing 27 Opposition to Motion re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) (Goldman, Neil)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT BRUCE S. HALLIDAY'S ANSWER to #24 , COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY CONCEPT SPECIAL RISKS against Counter Claimant Concept Special Risks, Ltd. Concept Special Risks, Ltd. by Bruce S. Halliday. (Goldman, Neil)
November 27, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE NEGOTIATED EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO LRCi 12.1 by Bruce S. Halliday re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Goldman, Neil)
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday Bruce S. Halliday by Concept Special Risks, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Application, #2 Exhibit B- Master Policy) (Moskowitz, Alex)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wager & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moskowitz, Alex)
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Moskowitz on behalf of Defendants Concept Special Risks, Ltd., Wager & Associates, Inc. (Moskowitz, Alex)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT BRUCE S. HALLIDAY'S ANSWER to #10 , COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Claimant Great Lakes Insurance SE Great Lakes Insurance SE by Bruce S. Halliday. (Goldman, Neil)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (RM) that The Clerk of Court shall issue a refund in the amount of Four Hundred and no/100 Dollars ($400.00) to counsel for plaintiff, Neil D. Goldman, Esq. (AO)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/30/2018. (Court Reporter N/A.) (TRH) (Main Document 19 replaced on 10/30/2018) (TRH).
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (RM): Status Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before District Judge Curtis V. Gomez. (AO)
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Errata Redline showing changes to memorandum filed on 10-28-18) (Goldman, Neil)
October 28, 2018 Filing 16 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday. (Goldman, Neil)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Moskowitz, Alex)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of service of initial disclosures by Great Lakes Insurance SE (Moskowitz, Alex)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Counter Claimant Great Lakes Insurance SE, Defendant Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Moskowitz, Alex)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce S. Halliday. Wager & Associates, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Wager) (Goldman, Neil)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Goldman, Neil)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff Bruce S. Halliday Bruce S. Halliday by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Application, #2 Exhibit B- Master Policy) (Moskowitz, Alex)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants filed by Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint-Redline, #2 Praecipe) (Goldman, Neil)
September 28, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed and Event is not the same. Counsel was notified as to re-filing of correct document. (TNS)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants filed by Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint-Redline, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint with Exhibits) (Goldman, Neil)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Moskowitz on behalf of Defendant Great Lakes Insurance SE (Moskowitz, Alex)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons issued (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wager & Associates, Inc.. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Concept Special Risks, Ltd.. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Great Lakes Insurance SE. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-742060.)filed by Bruce S. Halliday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons-Great Lakes, #4 Summons-Concept, #5 Summons-Wanger) (Goldman, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halliday v. Great Lakes Insurance SE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: Alex Moskowitz
Represented By: Alex M Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concept Special Risks, Ltd.
Represented By: Alex Moskowitz
Represented By: Alex M Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wager & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Moskowitz
Represented By: Alex M Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce S. Halliday
Represented By: Neil D Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?