Crown Bay Marina Lp v. Reef Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Crown Bay Marina Lp
Defendant: Evening Star -VICL, Reef Transportation and Morning Star-VICL
Case Number: 3:2018cv00073
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Reef Transportation. (Hodges, Gregory)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reef Transportation. (Hodges, Gregory)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory H. Hodges on behalf of Defendant Reef Transportation (Hodges, Gregory)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint by Reef Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Extension) (Hodges, Gregory)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons issued (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Reef Transportation. c/o Osbert Potter Office of the Lieutenant Governor. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Reef Transportation. c/o James A. Trilling (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Morning Star-VICL. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Evening Star -VICL. (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Crown Bay Marina LP against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-742141.)filed by Crown Bay Marina Lp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A To Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons - Evening Star-Reef Transport, #3 Exhibit Summons - Morning Star Reef Transport, #4 Exhibit Summons-Reef Transportation-Lt Gov Office, #5 Exhibit Summons - Registered Agent, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Bay Marina Lp v. Reef Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evening Star -VICL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reef Transportation
Represented By: Gregory H. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morning Star-VICL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Bay Marina Lp
Represented By: A. Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?