Hazelet et al v. MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC. et al
Plaintiff: Sue Hazelet and Robert Hazelet
Defendant: Marriott's Frenchman's Cove, ABC Corp., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club 1, JOHN DOE, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. and MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Case reopened -terminated in error. (CBF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC.. (Harney-Hiller, Niva)
October 21, 2019 Docketed in error. Civil Case Closed-Stipulation purst to Rule 41 (CBF) Modified on 10/21/2019 (CBF).
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiffs Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Feuerstein, Alan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of serving initial 26 disclosures by MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC. (Harney-Hiller, Niva)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Rule 26 Disclosure by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet (Feuerstein, Alan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Rule 26 Joint Discovery Plan by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Feuerstein, Alan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiffs Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. (Feuerstein, Alan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC.. (Brooks, Jennifer)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service & Summons on Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.) (Feuerstein, Alan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club 1 served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service & Summons on Marriott Vacation Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club I) (Feuerstein, Alan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service & Summons on Marriott Ownership Resorts St. Thomas) (Feuerstein, Alan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. Marriott's Frenchman's Cove served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service & Summons on Marriott Frenchman's Cove) (Feuerstein, Alan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Corp., JOHN DOE, MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC., Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club 1, Marriott's Frenchman's Covefiled by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. (Feuerstein, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Re-issued as to Marriott's Frenchman's Cove. (CBF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Re-Issued as to Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club 1. (CBF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Marriott's Frenchman's Cove, #2 Exhibit Summons Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club I) (Feuerstein, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marriott's Frenchman's Cove. (TRH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club 1. (TRH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.. (TRH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC.. (TRH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-805802.)filed by Robert Hazelet, Sue Hazelet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Marriott Ownership Resorts (St. Thomas), Inc., #2 Exhibit Summons Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., #3 Exhibit Summons Marriott's Frenchman's Cove, #4 Exhibit Summons Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club I, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Feuerstein, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazelet et al v. MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott's Frenchman's Cove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation d/b/a Marriott Vacation Club 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT OWNERSHIP RESORTS (ST. THOMAS), INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Quildon Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Hazelet
Represented By: Alan R. Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hazelet
Represented By: Alan R. Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?