Hendricks v. Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001 et al
Plaintiff: Luke Hendricks
Defendant: Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001 and Direct Insurance Group PLC t/a Aura Underwriting
Case Number: 3:2019cv00081
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001, Direct Insurance Group PLC t/a Aura Underwriting. (Duensing, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Duensing on behalf of Defendants Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001, Direct Insurance Group PLC t/a Aura Underwriting (Duensing, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Direct Insurance Group PLC t/a Aura Underwriting. (KAB)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001. (KAB)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-810820.)filed by Luke Hendricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Aura, #3 Summons to Lloyd's of London) (Cattie, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Hendricks
Represented By: David J. Cattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Insurers and Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing on Policy No. Aura17LukeH-1/1001
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Insurance Group PLC t/a Aura Underwriting
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?