Miga v. Jamis
Plaintiff: Humberto Miga
Defendant: Jared R. Jamis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00085
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service by Humberto Miga (Greene, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (TRH)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2019. (TRH)
November 8, 2019 Set Hearings (RM): Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in STT Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller.
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER(RM): Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 at 9:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before District Judge Curtis V. Gomez. Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Off-island counsel may appear by telephone for the status conference if there are no disputes pending.
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Humberto Miga. (Greene, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Jared R. Jamis. (Beckstedt, Carl)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order) (Greene, Ryan)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jared R. Jamis. (Beckstedt, Carl)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (RM) granting #4 Motion for Refund. (AO)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jared R. Jamis. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Complaint) (Beckstedt, Carl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Defendant Jared R. Jamis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Payment Confirmation, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing by Jared R. Jamis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant Jared R. Jamis (Beckstedt, Carl)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Humberto Miga from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-19-CV-471. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-811479)filed by Jared R. Jamis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Complaint) (Beckstedt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miga v. Jamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared R. Jamis
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Miga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?