Slack v. BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA et al
Plaintiff: Delita Slack
Defendant: BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA, Ascendancy,USVI, LLC and Jane Doe Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00089
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM/Motion to Dismiss /Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM/Motion to Dismiss by Defendant BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clive Claudius Rivers on behalf of Plaintiff Delita Slack (Rivers, Clive)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (RM) granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA's response to the complaint is due no later that October 25, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Diaz, Malorie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Malorie Diaz on behalf of Defendant BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA (Diaz, Malorie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Delita Slack Notice of Removal by Defendant Bank of Nova Scotia from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-19-CV-522. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-812871)filed by BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Diaz, Malorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slack v. BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA
Represented By: Malorie Diaz
Represented By: Carol Ann Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendancy,USVI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delita Slack
Represented By: Clive Claudius Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?