Georges v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Georges, Jr
Defendant: Tanya M Griffin and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00001
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Rule 16 Conference held on 2/6/2020. (Court Reporter n/a.) (TRH) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/6/2020) (TRH).
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (RM): Status Conference set for May 4, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Final Pretrial Conference set for May 6, 2021 at 10:00 AM in STT Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for May 17, 2021 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before District Judge Curtis V. Gomez. (AO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cole, Kimberly)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cole, Kimberly)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Cole, Kimberly)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cole, Kimberly)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hodge, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Substitution by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cole, Kimberly)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-19-cv-491. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cole, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georges v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya M Griffin
Represented By: Mark D. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Georges, Jr
Represented By: Julie G. Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?