Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3
Plaintiff: Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3
Case Number: 3:2020cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Commencement of Proceeding by Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association re #5 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3 re #8 Reply to, in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Hiller, Eric)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to re #6 Response filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Corrected) filed by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Responses due by 2/26/2020 (Hiller, Eric)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to re #6 Response filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association to Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Responses due by 2/25/2020 (Hiller, Eric)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Response re #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Event and Pdf do not match Re: #5 Notice (Other). (KAB)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Stipulation by Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association (Dodson, J. Daryl)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (RM) granting #3 Motion for refund of a duplicate filing fee. (AO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hiller, Eric)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. (Hiller, Eric)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3 from Superior Court of Virgin Islands, Division of St. Thomas, case number STT-19-647. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-830207)filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hiller, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3
Represented By: Eric Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association
Represented By: J. Daryl Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?