V.I. Housing Finance Authority v. Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London et.al.
Plaintiff: Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority
Defendant: John Does 1-50 and Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261
Case Number: 3:2020cv00006
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 Response re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority. (Delgado, Javier)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Mast on behalf of Defendant Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261 (Mast, Gregory)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261 re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mast, Gregory)
February 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Proposed order is needed. Re: #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (KAB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Substitution of Counsel by Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261 (Mast, Gregory)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Underlying Policy, #3 Exhibit C- Letter to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D- Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel) (Mast, Gregory)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to re #4 Response filed by Plaintiff Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority, #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261 filed by Defendant Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261. Responses due by 3/11/2020 (Mast, Gregory)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Response re #3 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261. (Mast, Gregory)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (RM) granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #2 MOTION to Dismiss, and Response re #3 MOTION to Remand: Response is due by 3/4/2020 and Reply is due by 3/4/2020.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Delgado, Javier)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Response, #3 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Delgado, Javier)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Response re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority. (Delgado, Javier)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Delgado, Javier)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Policy Wording, #3 Proposed Order) (Hudgins, Rachel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-19-CV-504. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-832597)filed by Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Policy Wording, #4 Exhibit D - Arbitration Demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudgins, Rachel) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/23/2020) (KAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V.I. Housing Finance Authority v. Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy P171261
Represented By: Rachel Erin Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgin Islands Housing Finance Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?