Hodge et al v. United State of America et al
Plaintiff: Harold A. Thomas, Osborne A. Hodge, Verl E. Thomas, Ademola Olugebefola, patricia smith, America Hodge Smith and Ida Smith
Defendant: Secretary of the Interior, National Park Services, U.S. Department of the Interior, David L. Bernhardt and United State of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00042
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03451. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (TNS)
May 14, 2020 Mailed a copy of #7 Order, to Osborne A. Hodge, 660 Riverside Drive, #1C, New York, NY 10044. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of the Virgin Islands. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court of the Virgin Islands. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/12/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Document filed by Osborne A. Hodge, Ademola Olugebefola, America Hodge Smith, Ida Smith, Patricia Smith, Harold A. Thomas, Verl E. Thomas. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Honorable William Barr, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Harold A. Thomas. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Park Service, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Harold A. Thomas..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Interior, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Harold A. Thomas. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David L. Bernhardt, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Harold A. Thomas..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David L. Bernhardt, National Park Services, Secretary of the Interior, U.S. Department of The Interior, United State of America. Document filed by Patricia Smith, Verl E. Thomas, Ademola Olugebefola, Ida Smith, Osborne A. Hodge, Harold A. Thomas, America Hodge Smith..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge et al v. United State of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osborne A. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verl E. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ademola Olugebefola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: patricia smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America Hodge Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?