Beatty v. Federal Express Virging Islands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kim Beatty
Defendant: Federal Express Virging Islands, Inc. and Federal Express Virgin Islands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00046
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond by Federal Express Virgin Islands, Inc.. (Moskowitz, Alex)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M Moskowitz on behalf of Defendant Federal Express Virgin Islands, Inc. (Moskowitz, Alex)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Beatty. Federal Express Virgin Islands, Inc. served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Greene, Ryan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Express Virgin Islands, Inc. (KAB)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Express Virging Islands, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-867421.)filed by Kim Beatty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Greene, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Federal Express Virging Islands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Beatty
Represented By: Ryan W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Virging Islands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Virgin Islands, Inc.
Represented By: Alex M Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?