Maxum Indemnity Company v. Crown Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Maxum Indemnity Company
Defendant: Crown Management Corporation, John Inverson, Jr., Richard Carey and Richard Brink
Case Number: 3:2020cv00058
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
2 Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company (Komives, Lisa)
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company (Komives, Lisa)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company (Komives, Lisa)
September 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The Attorney E-signature is needed on each document. Please re-file. Re: #19 Notice of Appearance, #17 Notice of Appearance, #18 Notice of Appearance. (KAB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company (Komives, Lisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company (Komives, Lisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company (Komives, Lisa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Richard Carey. (KAB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Richard Carey. (KAB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Richard Carey. (KAB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Richard Brink. (KAB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Crown Management Corporation. (KAB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Inverson, Jr.. (KAB)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Summons Issued to Defendants Crown Management Corporation, Richard Carey, Ralph Brink and John Iverson by Maxum Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons Issued to Defendants) (Komives, Lisa)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/24/2020 granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Toto (KMD)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/24/2020 granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Topol (KMD)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/24/2020 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anna Schaffner (KMD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Karen Toto(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-879439) by Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Karen Toto, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Komives, Lisa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: David Topol(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-879425) by Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of David Topol, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Komives, Lisa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Anna Schaffner(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-879412) by Plaintiff Maxum Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Anna Schaffner, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Komives, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL (RM). US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller recused. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. for all further proceedings (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Brink, Richard Carey, Crown Management Corporation, John Inverson, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-876146.)filed by Maxum Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crown Management Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Complaints, #3 Exhibit B - Complaints, #4 Exhibit B - Complaints, #5 Exhibit C - Letter dated February 10, 2020, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Komives, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxum Indemnity Company v. Crown Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Inverson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxum Indemnity Company
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Komives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?