Rhines v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Mr Eddie R Rhines
Defendant: Mr Eddie Wayne Jackson and St. Thomas Recreation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00068
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (RM) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Eddie Wayne Jackson: answer is due on or before October 5, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Eddie Wayne Jackson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilczynski, Mark)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Wilczynski on behalf of Defendant Eddie Wayne Jackson (Wilczynski, Mark)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie R Rhines. St. Thomas Recreation, LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Rivers, Clive)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie R Rhines. Eddie Wayne Jackson served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Rivers, Clive)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eddie Wayne Jackson. (KAB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to St. Thomas Recreation, LLC. (KAB)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-876589.)filed by Eddie R Rhines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons 1, #3 summon 2) (Rivers, Clive)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhines v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Eddie Wayne Jackson
Represented By: Mark Wilczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Thomas Recreation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Eddie R Rhines
Represented By: Clive Claudius Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?