Coates v. Ford Motor Company et al Re: 3:2018-cv-35 (St. Thomas Original case number)
Plaintiff: Millentine Coates
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and XYZ Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00063
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Filing 401 Notice of Service of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answers, Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories and Fifth Request for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin).
October 23, 2023 Filing 400 Response re #399 Supplement DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT MOTION FOR TRIAL DATE CERTAIN AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 399 SUPPLEMENT re #390 Joint MOTION for Trial Date Certain and Case Management Conference by Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2023 Filing 398 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 5, 2023 Filing 397 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 5, 2023 Filing 396 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 5, 2023 Filing 395 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 4, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #394 Response, #391 Response, #393 Response, #392 Response. Event and PDF don't match counsel needs to refile correctly. (TNS)
October 3, 2023 Filing 394 Response re #385 Notice to Take Deposition Duces Tecum for Dan Toomey (Objection) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 393 Response re #384 Notice to Take Deposition Duces Tecum of Greg Miller (Objection) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 392 Response re #383 Notice to Take Deposition Duces Tecum of Mark Sochor M. D. (Objection) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 391 Response re #386 Notice to Take Deposition Duces Tecum Ram Krishnaswami (Objections) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 390 Joint MOTION for Trial Date Certain and Case Management Conference by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER (RM): Status Conference held on September 28, 2023 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
September 28, 2023 Filing 388 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Status Conference held on 9/28/2023. (TRH)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER (RM): Status Conference previously set for September 28, 2023 at 11:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for September 28, 2023 at 12:00 PM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
September 27, 2023 Filing 386 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ram Krishnaswami by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 385 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dan Toomey by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 384 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Miller by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 383 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Sochor, M.D. by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 382 NOTICE Re-Notice of Taking Deposition of Stephen Sargent by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 381 NOTICE Re-Notice of Taking Deposition of Richard Rakes by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 380 NOTICE Re-Notice of Taking Deposition of Murali Yanamandra by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 379 NOTICE Re-Notice of Taking Deposition of Scott MacFarlane by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2023 Filing 378 NOTICE Third Amended Notice of Taking Deposition of Chris Caruso by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 19, 2023 Filing 377 NOTICE of Service by Millentine Coates re #352 Notice (Other) Response to 8th Request for Production (King, Robert)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER (RM) granting #373 Motion to Appear by Telephone or by Video. The Status Conference set for September 28, 2023 will be held via Microsoft Teams. Teams information shall be provided to all counsel. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
September 11, 2023 Filing 375 NOTICE Second Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Chris Caruso by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 374 Response re #373 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone or by Video and Concurrence in Relief Requested filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #374 Response Event and PDF don't match counsel needs to refile correctly. (TNS)
September 8, 2023 Filing 373 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone or by Video by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 7, 2023 Filing 372 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Millentine Coates by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
September 6, 2023 Filing 371 NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Murali Yanamandra by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpoena on Murali Yanamandra) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2023 Filing 370 NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Scott MacFarlane by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpoena on Scott MacFarlane) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2023 Filing 369 NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Stephen Sargent by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpoena on Stephen Sargent) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2023 Filing 368 NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Richard Rakes by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpoena on Richard Rakes) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 367 NOTICE Serivce of Production of Supplemental Expert Reports by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 28, 2023 Filing 366 OATH OF ADMISSION of Sylvia Macon Kastens Related Document: #365 (CAB)
August 28, 2023 Filing 365 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Attorney Admission Hearing held on 8/28/2023. (Court Reporter None.) (CAB)
August 24, 2023 Filing 364 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Murali Yanamandra by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2023 Filing 363 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Rakes by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2023 Filing 362 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Sargent by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2023 Filing 361 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott MacFarlane by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2023 Filing 360 NOTICE Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 22, 2023 Filing 359 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dan Bagwell by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 22, 2023 Filing 358 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Altman by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing for Sylvia Macon Kastens, Esq., is set for August 28, 2023 at 09:30 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided by email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER (RM) dated 8/21/2023 that Sylvia Macon Kastens, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 18, 2023 Filing 355 NOTICE of Objection to Defendant's Notice of Taking Deposition, Duces Tecum, of Kelly Kennett by Millentine Coates re #308 Notice (Other) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2023 Filing 354 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoenas by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Murali Yanamandra, #2 Subpoena to Richard Rakes, #3 Subpoena to Scott MacFarlane, #4 Subpoena to Stephen Sargent) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2023 Filing 353 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Dan Bagwell, R.N. by Millentine Coates re #318 Notice (Other) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 352 NOTICE Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 16, 2023 Filing 351 NOTICE Notice of Proof of Service by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 16, 2023 Filing 350 NOTICE Notice of Proof of Service by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 13, 2023 Filing 349 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's 8/13/2023 Supplemental Production to Rule 26 Disclosures by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
August 13, 2023 Filing 348 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Ford's Seventh Requests for Production by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
August 11, 2023 Filing 347 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chris Caruso by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 9, 2023 Filing 346 Notice of Taking Deposition of Duces Tecum of Heather Phillips by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin).
August 9, 2023 Filing 345 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Sylvia Macon Kastens(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1084231) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhbit 3) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 8, 2023 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER (RM) denying Ford Motor Company's Motion to Compel #289 . (AO)
August 8, 2023 Filing 343 OATH OF ADMISSION Related Document: 333 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing for Davis M. Walsh, Esq. (IW)
August 8, 2023 Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Attorney Admission Hearing held on 8/8/2023. (IW)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER (RM) finding as moot #316 Motion to Compel as Ford has advised the dispute was resolved. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER (RM): The show cause hearing previously scheduled for August 11, 2023 for The New Ashley's Restaurant is CANCELLED. Ford shall notify The New Ashley's Restaurant of the cancellation. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 7, 2023 Filing 339 NOTICE Resolution of Discovery Dispute with New Ashley's by Ford Motor Company re #326 Order,, Set Hearings, (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER (RM) finding as moot #335 Motion to Continue as it was withdrawn. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 6, 2023 Filing 337 NOTICE Withdrawal of Motion to Continue by Ford Motor Company re #335 MOTION to Continue Swearing in of Atty. Walsh (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 4, 2023 Filing 336 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Response to Requests for Production by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
August 4, 2023 Filing 335 MOTION to Continue Swearing in of Atty. Walsh by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 4, 2023 Filing 334 NOTICE Plaintiff's Production of Document's On behalf of Ashley's Restaurant by Millentine Coates re #326 Order,, Set Hearings, (King, Robert)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing for Davis M. Walsh, Esq., is set for August 8, 2023 at 09:30 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided by email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
August 4, 2023 Filing 332 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER (RM) dated 8/4/2023 that Davis M. Walsh, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 3, 2023 Filing 330 NOTICE Notice of Proof of Service by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 3, 2023 Filing 329 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Oriental Bank (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 3, 2023 Filing 328 Subpoena Returned Executed as to First Bank (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 3, 2023 Filing 327 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Davis M. Walsh(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1083302) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhbit 3) (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER (RM): Ford shall cause a copy of its motion to compel, and this Order, to be served upon The New Ashleys Restaurant, within five business days of the date of this Order. Show Cause Hearing set for August 11, 2023 at 09:15 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO)
July 28, 2023 Filing 325 NOTICE First Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Kelly Kennett by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER (RM) granting in part Ford Motor Company's unopposed motion to extend certain of the scheduling order deadlines #317 . Status Conference set for September 28, 2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for March 18, 2024 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Robert A. Molloy. (AO)
July 26, 2023 Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
July 25, 2023 Filing 322 NOTICE Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Dr. James Nelson by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 14, 2023 Filing 321 NOTICE of Service by Millentine Coates re #313 Notice (Other) (King, Robert)
July 14, 2023 Filing 320 NOTICE Second Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 14, 2023 Filing 319 NOTICE Notice of Taking Deposition of Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 14, 2023 Filing 318 NOTICE First Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 7, 2023 Filing 317 MOTION DEFENDANT, FORD MOTOR COMPANYS, UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 30, 2023 Filing 316 MOTION to Compel The New Ashley's Restaurant's Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 26, 2023 Filing 315 NOTICE First Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 22, 2023 Filing 314 NOTICE Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 313 NOTICE Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 312 NOTICE Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 311 NOTICE Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 310 NOTICE Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 309 NOTICE Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 308 NOTICE Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 307 NOTICE Notices of Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 306 NOTICE Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 305 NOTICE Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 14, 2023 Filing 304 REPORT of Mediation by Andrew L. Capdeville, Esq. The parties have reached a total impasse, all issues require Court action. (IW)
June 14, 2023 Filing 303 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena FirstBank VI, #2 Exhibit Subpoena Oriental Bank) (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 9, 2023 Filing 302 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant, Ford Motor Company's, Seventh Request for Production by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2023 Filing 301 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories (King, Robert)
May 30, 2023 Filing 300 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 6/12/2023 (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 23, 2023 Filing 299 Response re #289 MOTION to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum Dated March 10, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER (RM) finding as moot #284 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, or in the Alternative, Motion to Limit Testimony by Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, as it was withdrawn by docket entry 297. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 15, 2023 Filing 297 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Ford Motor Company re #284 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, or in the Alternative, Motion to Limit Testimony by Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 11, 2023 Filing 296 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Exhibit 6 of Docket Entry 290-6 by Millentine Coates re #290 Response,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Exhibit 6 of Docket Entry 290-6) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER (RM): Motion to seal exhibit 6 of docket entry 290-6 is granted. Within five days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall refile a properly redacted version of exhibit 6. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
May 9, 2023 Filing 294 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Millentine Coates re #293 MOTION to Seal Document (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2023 Filing 293 MOTION to Seal Document by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2023 Filing 292 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Virgin Islands Housing Authority (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 291 NOTICE Intent to Serve Subpoenas by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2023 Filing 290 Response re #284 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, or in the Alternative, Motion to Limit Testimony by Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - disclosure statement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Caruso report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 30b6, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Kemnitz, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Kemnitz Testimony, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Clark, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Correspondence) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2023 Filing 289 MOTION to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum Dated March 10, 2023 by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 1, 2023 Filing 288 NOTICE of Service of Expert Disclosures by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 1, 2023 Filing 287 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/17/2023, before Judge Ruth Miller, Magistrate Judge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Williams, Telephone number 518-465-8029. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/25/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2023. (CAB)
May 1, 2023 Filing 286 NOTICE Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 27, 2023 Filing 285 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company Re VIHA Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to VIHA) (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 24, 2023 Filing 284 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, or in the Alternative, Motion to Limit Testimony by Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 21, 2023 Filing 283 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, or in the Alternative, Motion to Limit Testimony by Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 21, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #283 MOTION to Strike. The document is neither dated nor signed. Filer is instructed to refile. (IW)
April 19, 2023 Filing 282 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Luis Bachelor (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 19, 2023 Filing 281 NOTICE of Interrogatories by Gaylin Vogel (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 14, 2023 Filing 280 NOTICE of Objection to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notices of Taking Deposition by Millentine Coates re #277 Notice to Take Deposition, #276 Notice to Take Deposition (Meyers, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #275 Notice (Other). The document title and event do not match. (JC)
April 5, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #279 Notice (Other). The document title and event do not match. (JC)
April 4, 2023 Filing 279 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Rule 26 Expert Disclosures by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nelson Follow up Evaluation) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2023 Filing 278 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charlesworth Richards (Second Amended) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 4, 2023 Filing 277 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Luis Bachelor by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 4, 2023 Filing 276 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Reynika Patterson by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
April 3, 2023 Filing 275 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Rule 26 Expert Disclosures by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Edgcombe) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2023 Filing 274 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Expert Disclosures by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kennett Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Caruso Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Thomson Expert Report, #4 Exhibit Life Care Plan, #5 Exhibit Fonseca Expert Report, #6 Exhibit Nelson Expert Report, #7 Exhibit Moss Expert Report) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2023 Filing 273 NOTICE of Service by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2023 Filing 272 Response re #265 Notice to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative(s) Knowledgeable to Provide Testimony on the Topics Listed in Exhibit A filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 27, 2023 Filing 271 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Millentine Coates. Amendment to #269 Notice to Take Deposition Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Jay Appukutty. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2023 Filing 270 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Discovery Responses by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2023 Filing 269 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jay Appukutty by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2023 Filing 268 NOTICE Intent to Serve Subpoenas by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2023 Filing 267 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Amended by Millentine Coates for proceedings held on 2/17/2023 before Judge Ruth Miller.. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order Form) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2023 Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ford Motor Company for proceedings held on February 17, 2023 before Judge Ruth Miller.. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order Form) (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 20, 2023 Filing 265 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative (Second Amended) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2023 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Plaintiff's Request/Ordering of Omnibus Hearing Transcript h by Millentine Coates for proceedings held on February 17, 2023 before Judge Ruth Miller.. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2023 Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ford Motor Company for proceedings held on February 17, 2023 before Judge Ruth Miller.. (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 20, 2023 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Plaintiff's Requesting and Ordering of Omnibus Hearing Transcript by Millentine Coates for proceedings held on February 17, 2023 before Judge Ruth Miller.. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The document was not filed by the attorney whose electronic signature is reflected. Re: #262 Transcript Request. (KW)
March 17, 2023 Civil Case Closed (TNS)
March 14, 2023 Filing 261 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Todd Clark (Amended) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2023 Filing 260 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Todd Clark by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2023 Filing 259 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Rosetta Lewis (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 14, 2023 Filing 258 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Lorna Murray (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 14, 2023 Filing 257 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Charlesworth Richards (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER (RM): The parties' Stipulated Non-Sharing Protective Order [255-1] is Approved and Entered, with the exception that any party seeking to file any material under seal pursuant to paragraph 11 must first seek and obtain leave of Court to do so. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 9, 2023 Filing 255 NOTICE Filing Stipulated Non-Sharing Protective Order (Veoneer US, Inc.) by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Non-Sharing Protective Order) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2023 Filing 254 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charlesworth Richards by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 9, 2023 Filing 253 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lorna Murray by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 9, 2023 Filing 252 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Losita Lewis a/k/a Rosetta Lewis by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 8, 2023 Filing 251 NOTICE to Serve Subpoena to Testify at Deposition Duces Tecum on Veoneer US, Inc by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2023 Filing 250 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to CBP, #2 Exhibit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 27, 2023 Filing 249 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company Re: Ford's Sixth Request for Production (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER (RM) denying #157 Motion for Entry of Protective Order. (AO)
February 23, 2023 Filing 247 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER (RM) granting in part and denying in part #245 Motion to Seal. The following docket entries shall be sealed: 164-1, 173, 175-1, 199-1. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 22, 2023 Filing 245 MOTION to Seal Documents Nos. 164, 173, 175 and 199 by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 17, 2023 Filing 244 NOTICE of Filing the Deposition Transcript of Charlesworth Richards by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 17, 2023 Filing 243 OATH OF ADMISSION of Jacob A. Derrick, Esquire Related Document: #238 (CAB)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER (RM): Plaintiff's Second Motion to Extend Scheduling Order is granted in part and denied in part. (AO)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER (RM): For the reasons stated on the record on February 17, 2023, denying #160 Motion to employ a court reporter at status conferences (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER (RM): For the reasons stated on the record on February 17, 2023, denying #199 Amended Motion to Compel CBP Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER (RM) finding as moot #228 Motion to appear remotely. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 17, 2023 Filing 238 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Omnibus Hearing held on 2/17/2023. (Court Reporter FTR GOLD RECORDER.) (TRH) (Main Document 238 replaced on 2/17/2023) (TRH).
February 17, 2023 Filing 237 Oath of Admission by Jacob Derrick Esq. (TRH)
February 16, 2023 Filing 236 Opposition to Motion re #199 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant, Ford Motor Company's, Amended Motion to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance with Subpena Duces Tecum. (EMK)
February 16, 2023 Filing 235 Limited Notice of Appearance on behalf of the United States of America, Department of Homeland Security, Customs and Border Protection. (EMK)
February 16, 2023 Filing 234 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Process Server) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER (RM) granting #193 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jacob A. Derrick, Esquire is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (AO)
February 15, 2023 Filing 232 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2023. (TRH)
February 15, 2023 Filing 231 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 15, 2023 Filing 230 Response re #228 MOTION to allow Atty. Jeffrey T. Meyers to appear via Teams or in the alternative motion to continue Omnibus Hearing filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER (RM): Telephonic Status Conference set for February 15, 2023 at 03:30 PM, Atlantic Time, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Conference call information will be provided to counsel via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
February 14, 2023 Filing 228 MOTION to allow Atty. Jeffrey T. Meyers to appear via Teams or in the alternative motion to continue Omnibus Hearing by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey T. Meyers, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
February 14, 2023 Filing 227 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 14, 2023 Filing 226 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 14, 2023 Filing 225 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 13, 2023 Filing 224 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 10, 2023 Filing 223 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wilfred Tong by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 10, 2023 Filing 222 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Williams by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 10, 2023 Filing 221 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Albertine Joseph by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 9, 2023 Filing 220 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company Re: Response to Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative(s) Knowledgeable to Provide Testimony on the Topics Listed in Exhibit A (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 8, 2023 Filing 219 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Losita Lewis by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 8, 2023 Filing 218 REPLY to re #209 Response, filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 7, 2023 Filing 217 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lorna Murray by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER (RM): Omnibus Hearing set for February 17, 2023 at 11:00 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
February 7, 2023 Filing 215 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 214 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Loretta Jarvis by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 213 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 212 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 4, 2023 Filing 211 NOTICE of Filing Updated Certificate of Good Standing by Millentine Coates re #193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jacob Derrick, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1044644) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (King, Robert)
February 3, 2023 Filing 210 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Status Conference by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 209 Response re #199 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant, Ford Motor Company's, Amended Motion to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance with Subpena Duces Tecum filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
February 2, 2023 Filing 208 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 31, 2023 Filing 207 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to AAA Storage, #2 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Crowley Maritime Corp., #3 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Tropical Shipping, #4 Subpoena Duces Tecum to U-Haul) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 31, 2023 Filing 206 MOTION for Status Conference by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 27, 2023 Filing 205 REPLY to re #203 Response, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Responses due by 2/9/2023 (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2023 Filing 204 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative (amended) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #201 Notice of Filing. Filer's Login does not match the electronic s-signature and signature block on this document. Filer did refile correctly at #202 . (IW)
January 24, 2023 Filing 203 Response re #187 Notice (Other) Defendant, Ford Motor Company's, Response to Plaintiff Millentine Coates' Second Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Dates by 90 days filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 24, 2023 Filing 202 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 24, 2023 Filing 201 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
January 20, 2023 Filing 200 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2023 Filing 199 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant, Ford Motor Company's, Amended Motion to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance with Subpena Duces Tecum by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 20, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #199 Amended MOTION to Compel. Pursuant to LRCi 7.1(e) a draft Order is required when filing a motion. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Filing Proposed Order as the main document, attach a draft order to the main document and link the filing to the Motion. (IW)
January 19, 2023 Filing 198 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories from Plaintiff, Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2023 Filing 197 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories from Plaintiff, Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2023 Filing 196 Response re #175 MOTION to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance With Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2023 Filing 195 NOTICE Notice of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 17, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY FILER SHOULD RE-SUBMIT AN UPDATED CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDINGRe: #193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jacob Derrick, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1044644). (CAB)
January 12, 2023 Filing 194 Affidavit in Support re #193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jacob Derrick, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1044644) Petition in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
January 12, 2023 Filing 193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jacob Derrick, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1044644) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application for Admission ProHac Vice, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (King, Robert)
January 12, 2023 Filing 192 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 11, 2023 Filing 191 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 11, 2023 Filing 190 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 11, 2023 Filing 189 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 11, 2023 Filing 188 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 187 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Millentine Coates re #185 Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Dates by 90 Days , #186 Memorandum in Support to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2023 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Support re #185 Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Dates by 90 Days filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2023 Filing 185 Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Dates by 90 Days by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2023 Filing 184 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Coreen Ross (Amended) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 183 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alvin K. Ross (Amended) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 182 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Everton Coates (Amended) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 181 Subpoena Returned executed (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2023 Filing 180 Subpoena Returned executed (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2023 Filing 179 Subpoena Returned executed (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2023 Filing 178 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Hillbish Ford, #2 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Brother's Tire Sales, #3 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Kirk's Lube & Brake Clinic) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 4, 2023 Filing 177 NOTICE of service by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2023 Filing 176 NOTICE of service by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2023 Filing 175 MOTION to Compel U.S. Customs and Border Protection's Compliance With Subpoena Duces Tecum by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 29, 2022 Filing 174 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 28, 2022 Filing 173 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 172 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 22, 2022 Filing 171 REPLY to re #165 Response, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Responses due by 1/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2022 Filing 170 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Everton Coates by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 21, 2022 Filing 169 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Coreen Ross by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 21, 2022 Filing 168 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Subpoena) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2022 Filing 167 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Subpoena) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2022 Filing 166 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Subpoena) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2022 Filing 165 Response re #157 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 164 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to VITEMA, #2 Exhibit A) (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 163 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 5, 2022 Filing 162 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Millentine Coates re #157 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2022 Filing 161 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company Re: Ford's Fifth Request for Production of Documents to Production (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 5, 2022 Filing 160 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Permission to Employ A Court Reporter At Status Conference by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 2, 2022 Filing 159 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
December 2, 2022 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM in Support re #157 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2022 Filing 157 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #157 MOTION for Protective Order . Pursuant to LRCi 7.1(e) a draft Order is required when filing a Motion. The Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Filing Proposed Order as the main document, attach the draft order to the main document and link the document to the Motion. (IW)
November 29, 2022 Filing 156 NOTICE (Amended) Plaintiff's Notice of Entry on Land for Inspection and Other Purposes by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #154 . Pursuant to LRCi 5.4(h)(1), electronically filed documents must include electronic signatures for both local and pro hac vice counsel. As a result, counsel is advised to refile document. (EMK)
November 28, 2022 Filing 154 NOTICE of Entry on Land for Inspection and Other Purposes by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2022 Filing 153 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Sherwayne Towing and Trucking) (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 22, 2022 Filing 152 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 22, 2022 Filing 151 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 22, 2022 Filing 150 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 17, 2022 Filing 149 NOTICE of Interrogatories by Gaylin Vogel (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 16, 2022 Filing 148 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 147 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charlesworth Richards by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 146 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alvin K. Ross by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 145 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Amy C. Miller by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael E. Miller by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 143 NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Records Custodian by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Topics, #2 Exhibit Documents) (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 2, 2022 Filing 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Status Conference held on 11/2/2022. (TRH)
October 28, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Gerry Wood Automotive, LLC) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER (RM): Status Conference held on October 27, 2022 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Discovery Conference set for November 1, 2022 at 02:00 PM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
October 27, 2022 Filing 139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Status Conference held on 10/27/2022. (KW)
October 26, 2022 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Tompkins by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2022 Filing 137 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant, Ford Motor Company's Fourth Request for Production to Plaintiff by Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2022 Filing 136 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to The New Ashley's Restaurant) (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 22, 2022 Filing 135 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER (RM): Ford Motor Company's Motion to Take Second Deposition of Charlesworth Richards and for Sanctions #133 is denied without prejudice for failing to first seek a conference with the Court to attempt an informal resolution of the dispute, as required by the Courts Trial Management Order. (AO)
September 21, 2022 Filing 133 MOTION Motion to Take Second Deposition of Charlesworth Richards and for Sanctions by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 19, 2022 Filing 132 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 14, 2022 Filing 131 NOTICE of Service of Ford's Fourth Request for Production to Plaintiff by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER (RM) granting in part #122 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order. Status conference set for October 27, 2022 at 11:00 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial reset for November 27, 2023 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Robert A. Molloy. (AO)
August 30, 2022 Filing 129 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 30, 2022 Filing 128 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 30, 2022 Filing 127 Subpoena Returned Executed (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 30, 2022 Filing 126 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 29, 2022 Filing 125 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 18, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to American Airlines, #2 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Delta Airlines, #3 Subpoena Duces Tecum to JetBlue Airlines, #4 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Spirit Airlines, #5 Subpoena Duces Tecum to United Airlines, #6 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Norweigian Cruise Lines, #7 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Premier Tax & Bookkeeping Services) (Vogel, Gaylin)
August 17, 2022 Filing 122 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Dates by 120 Days (Unopposed) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Meyers, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 121 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to CBP, #2 Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 27, 2022 Filing 120 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Officer Joycelyn Lee-Bobb by Millentine Coates and Certificate of Service (Meyers, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2022 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Status Conference held on 7/13/2022. (TRH)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER (RM): Video status conference held on July 13, 2022 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Next status conference set for October 27, 2022 at 11:00 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
July 13, 2022 Filing 117 NOTICE of Production by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
July 6, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charlesworth Richards by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
June 30, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff, Millentine Coates by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 29, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE of Unavailability by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
June 23, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (King, Robert)
June 22, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE Of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Third Request for Production of Documents by Millentine Coates re #98 Notice (Other) (King, Robert)
June 9, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Millentine Coates by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
June 9, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Millentine Coates by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Barnes, Daryl)
June 9, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #110 Notice to Take Deposition. Filer's signature and Login do not match. Filer did correct and refiled at #111 . (IW)
June 6, 2022 Filing 109 OATH OF ADMISSION of Jennifer E. Nolander, Esquire Related Document: #108 (CAB)
June 6, 2022 Filing 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Conference held on 6/6/2022. (TRH)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission hearing for Jennifer E. Nolander, Esq., is set for June 6, 2022 at 9:45 AM via Microsoft Teams, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER (RM) dated 5/24/2022 that #104 Jennifer E. Nolander, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
May 19, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole-Lynn King-Richardson on behalf of Plaintiff Millentine Coates (King-Richardson, Nicole-Lynn)
May 19, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Nolander of Attorney: Jennifer Nolander(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1004882) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 19, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #99 Motion. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to LRCi 5.2(a) The attorney for each party in any case shall promptly file an appearance, giving the address where all notices and papers may be served upon the attorney. (IW)
May 12, 2022 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/12/2022. (Court Reporter FTR GOLD RECORDER.) (TRH)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER (RM) finding as moot #101 Motion to appear as witness remotely. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 12, 2022 Filing 101 MOTION to allow witness to appear via teams by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (King-Richardson, Nicole-Lynn)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER (RM) granting #99 Motion to Allow Nicole-Lynn King Richardson to appear by video conference. Conference information shall be provided to counsel via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
May 11, 2022 Filing 99 MOTION to Continue May 12, 2022 Hearing or in the alternative a motion to conduct the hearing via TEAMS by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (King-Richardson, Nicole-Lynn)
May 9, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE of Service of Ford Motor Company's Third Request for Production to Plaintiff by Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 6, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE of Filing by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (King, Robert)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER (RM) granting #95 Motion to appear by telephone of Attorney Courtney M. King. Call-in information will be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 95 MOTION to Appear by Telephone to the May 12, 2022 Hearing by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER (RM): Metro Motors shall, through an appropriate representative, appear and show cause on May 12, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the District Court of the Virgin Islands why it should not be held in contempt for failing to comply with the subpoena. (AO)
May 2, 2022 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/2/2022. (Court Reporter FTR.) (K, W)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER (RM) granting #91 Motion to appear by telephone of Attorney Courtney M. King. Call-in information will be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 25, 2022 Filing 91 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin) Modified on 4/27/2022 (CAB).
April 19, 2022 Filing 90 HARD COPY NOTICE of filing sent to Metro Motors Related Document: #89 (K, W)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER (RM): Metro Motors shall, through an appropriate representative, appear and show cause on May 2, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the District Court of the Virgin Islands why it should not be held in contempt for failing to comply with the subpoena. The Clerk of Court shall forthwith send a copy of this order to Metro Motors via certified mail return receipt. (AO)
April 14, 2022 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Status Conference held on 4/14/2022. (TRH)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER (RM): Interim video conference held on April 14, 2022 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Status Conference set for July 13, 2022 at 02:00 PM via Microsoft Teams before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Conference information will be provided to counsel by email. (AO)
March 29, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Production by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
March 25, 2022 Filing 85 OATH OF ADMISSION of Jenny L. Zavadil, Esquire Related Document: #84 (CAB)
March 24, 2022 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Attorney Admission Hearing held on 3/24/2022. (TRH)
March 22, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Gaylin Vogel on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Vogel, Gaylin)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission hearing for Jenny L. Zavadil, Esq., is set for March 24, 2022 at 9:30 AM via Microsoft Teams, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER (RM) dated 3/15/2022 that #78 Jenny L. Zavadil, Esquire is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
March 11, 2022 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support re #79 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Metro Motors should not be held in Contempt of Court and to Enforce Subpoena for Documents filed by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Affidavit Return of Service) (King, Robert)
March 11, 2022 Filing 79 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Metro Motors should not be held in Contempt of Court and to Enforce Subpoena for Documents by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
March 4, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jenny L. Zavadil(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-987949) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
February 24, 2022 Filing 77 Joint ESI Protocol by Millentine Coates re #74 Order, Set Hearings (King, Robert)
February 18, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The document was not filed by the attorney whose electronic signature is reflected. Re: #76 Notice (Other). (K, W)
February 15, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE Joint ESI Protocol by Millentine Coates re #74 Order, Set Hearings (King, Robert)
February 15, 2022 Filing 75 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Response to Court Order Dated January 31, 2022 by Ford Motor Company re #74 Order, Set Hearings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Ford's ESI Protocol, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Joint ESI (waiting on Coates Approval)) (Vogel, Gaylin)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER (RM): Interim video conference held on January 27, 2022 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Status Conference set for April 14, 2022 at 11:00 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO)
January 27, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/14/2022 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Team's video conference information shall be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (TRH) Modified on 1/27/2022 (TRH).
January 27, 2022 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Team's Video Status Conference held on 1/27/2022. (TRH)
January 12, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Intent to Service Subpoena by Millentine Coates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (King, Robert)
December 29, 2021 Filing 70 OATH OF ADMISSION of Courtney King, Esquire Related Document: #40 (CAB)
December 29, 2021 Filing 69 OATH OF ADMISSION of Ashley Dunbar, Esquire Related Document: #40 (CAB)
December 29, 2021 Filing 68 OATH OF ADMISSION of Scott Richman, Esquire Related Document: #40 (CAB)
December 29, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Deposition of Officer Joycelyn Lee-Bobb by Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
December 8, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE Withdrawal by Ford Motor Company of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Ashley B. Dunbar (Barnes, Daryl)
November 24, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl C Barnes on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Barnes, Daryl)
November 22, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE Defendant's ESI Protocol by Ford Motor Company re #59 Trial Management Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix Ex A) (Vogel, Gaylin)
November 9, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company Second Request for Production of Documents (Barnes, Daryl)
October 29, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE filing Exhibit to Answer to SAC by Ford Motor Company re #61 Answer to Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Answer) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 61 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts III and IV by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 59 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (RM): Status Conference set for January 27, 2022 at 10:00 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for August 14, 2023 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Robert A. Molloy. (AO)
October 25, 2021 Filing 58 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. (King, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER (RM) granting #55 Motion for Protective Order. The parties' Stipulated Protective Order [55-1] is approved and ENTERED, with the exception that any issues related to the use of protected information or documents in the course of the trial of this matter as described in paragraph 11 shall be determined by the presiding judge. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Team's Video Rule 16, Conference held on 10/25/2021. (TRH)
October 22, 2021 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Coates and by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 54 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 53 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - protective order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Vogel, Gaylin)
October 18, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Service by Ford Motor Company Initial Disclosure Statement (Barnes, Daryl)
October 1, 2021 Filing 50 OATH OF ADMISSION of Kanwarpreet S. Khahra, Esquire Related Document: #49 (CAB) (CAB).
September 30, 2021 Filing 51 OATH OF ADMISSION of Jeffrey T. Meyers, Esquire Related Document: #49 (CAB) (CAB).
September 30, 2021 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Oath of Admission Hearing held on 9/30/2021. (TRH)
September 29, 2021 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company.. (Vogel, Gaylin)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission hearing for Kanwarpreet S. Khahra, Esq., and Jeffrey T. Meyers, is set for September 30, 2021 at 11:00 AM via Microsoft Teams, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided by email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (RM) dated 9/14/2021 that #43 Kanwarpreet S. Khahra, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (RM) dated 9/14/2021 that #42 Jeffrey T. Meyers, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
September 3, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Kanwarpreet S. Khahra(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-953869) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Petition to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Application, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jeffrey T. Meyers(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-953864) by Plaintiff Millentine Coates. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Petition to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Application, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. King on behalf of Plaintiff Millentine Coates (King, Robert)
August 25, 2021 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Oath of Admission Hearing held on 8/25/2021. (TRH)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission for defendant Ford Motor Company's pro hac vice counsel shall be administered on August 25, 2021 at 3:00 PM via Microsoft Teams before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information shall be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (RM) dated 8/18/2021 that #35 the motion is GRANTED and Ashley D. Dunbar, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER (RM) dated 8/18/2021 that #34 the motion is GRANTED and Courtney M. King, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (RM) dated 8/18/2021 that #33 the motion is GRANTED and Scott A.Richman, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 18, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Ashley D. Dunbar(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-951218) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
August 18, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Courtney M. King(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-951215) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
August 18, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Scott A. Richman(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-951213) by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Daryl)
July 29, 2021 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-11509. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (TRH)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER granting #28 Motion to transfer case, and denying #19 Motion to dismiss without prejudice. Case transferred to the District Court of the Virgin Islands. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Case transferred to District of Virgin Islands. (VLun) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1) (Khahra, Kanwarpreet) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Transfer Case Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Retranser filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Fords Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Doc #26, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Amended Opposition and Motion to Transfer, Doc #45, #4 Exhibit C - Opinion, Doc #62, #5 Exhibit D - May 14, 2020 Transfer Order, Doc #63, #6 Exhibit E - Correspondence regarding vehicle inspection and expert information, #7 Exhibit F - Correspondence regarding Veoneer, #8 Exhibit G - Correspondence regarding Ford Motor Companys Responses and Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production and Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs Deposition Notices and Correspondence, #10 Exhibit I - Correspondence regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production Ford served on Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit J - Ford Motor Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Interrogatory No. 5-, #12 Exhibit K - Police Report (with redactions), #13 Exhibit L - Plaintiffs Answer to Ford Motor Companys Interrogatory No. 1 (with redactions), #14 Exhibit M - Cleveland Clinic Records (with redactions)) (Nystrom, Paul) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer Case by Millentine Coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit No. 2) (Meyers, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Following April 5, 2021 Conference. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/5/2021 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record). (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
April 4, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 4/5/2021 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Joint Statement. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding Hearing. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Ford Motor Company's First Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #10 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Ford Motor Company's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Ford Motor Company's Reply Regarding Its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Nystrom, Paul) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Ford Motor Company's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion of VI court, #2 Exhibit Bruce v. Howarth, 2014 WL 834184, #3 Exhibit Humphries, 2020 WL 3248896, #4 Exhibit Hastings v Baird, 2018 WL 3728932., #5 Exhibit Gaillet v Ford, 2017 WL 1684632, #6 Exhibit Thompson, 590 Fed. Appx. 532) (Khahra, Kanwarpreet) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Ford Motor Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Nystrom, Paul) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Ford Motor Company's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit B - Defendant Ford Motor Companys Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit C - First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Memorandum Opinion, #6 Exhibit E - Order Transferring Action, #7 Exhibit F - Humphries v Allstate Ins. Co., #8 Exhibit G - Hastings v Baird) (Nystrom, Paul) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Parties. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Khahra, Kanwarpreet) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED #2 Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Khahra, Kanwarpreet) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/20/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #10 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ford Motor Company (Rucker, Bryce) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 8/20/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey T. Meyers appearing on behalf of Millentine Coates (Meyers, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kanwarpreet Singh Khahra appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Khahra, Kanwarpreet) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Representation. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Doc #20), #3 Exhibit B - Fords Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law (Doc #5), #4 Exhibit C - 5/14/20 Memorandum Opinion (Doc #62), #5 Exhibit D - 5/14/20 Order (Doc #63), #6 Exhibit E - Humphries v. Allstate Ins. Co., #7 Exhibit F - Hastings v. Baird) (Nystrom, Paul) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce A. Rucker on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Rucker, Bryce) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Nystrom on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Nystrom, Paul) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge David M. Lawson to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from Virgin Islands; Case Number 3:18-cv-00035. [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the District of the Virgin Islands. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (RAM) The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this matter to the Eastern District of Michigan. Ford Motor Company's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, ECF #25 , is MOOT. (CAA) [Transferred from vid on 6/10/2020.] [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION (RAM) (CAA) [Transferred from vid on 6/10/2020.] [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Millentine Coatesfiled by Millentine Coates. (King, Robert) [Transferred from vid on 6/10/2020.] [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Ford Motor Company from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, Division of St. Thomas/St. John, case number ST-18-CV-140. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-727693)filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Barnes, Daryl) [Transferred from Virgin Islands; Case Number 3:18-cv-00035. ] [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Ford Motor Company et al Re: 3:2018-cv-35 (St. Thomas Original case number)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millentine Coates
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Meyers
Represented By: Kanwarpreet Singh Khahra
Represented By: Kanwarpreet S. Khahra
Represented By: Robert L. King
Represented By: Jeffrey Meyers
Represented By: Nicole-Lynn King-Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Scott A. Richman
Represented By: Bryce A. Rucker
Represented By: Paul L. Nystrom
Represented By: Ashley D. Dunbar
Represented By: Courtney M. King
Represented By: Daryl C Barnes
Represented By: Gaylin Vogel
Represented By: Jennifer E. Nolander
Represented By: Jenny L. Zavadil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?