Cotto et al v. Toliver et al
Plaintiff: Abiel Cotto, Benjamin Osorio, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, David Gautreaux, Jeremy Ramirez, Norberto Frese, Rafael Lugo, Braylin Lambert and Blaine Lambert
Defendant: Gerald Toliver, Thomas J Sutton, TJ Sutton Enterprises, LLC, Citadel Recovery Services, LLC and AECOM CARIBE, LLP
Case Number: 3:2022cv00052
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #18 Opposition to Motion,, to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez. (LYNCH, PETER)
October 3, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #23 Reply to Opposition to Motion, Event and PDF don't match. Correct event is Notice of Appearance , Counsel is instructed to refile. (TNS).
September 30, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #18 Opposition to Motion,, to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez. (LYNCH, PETER)
September 30, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #22 Reply to Opposition to Motion, Event and PDF don't match counsel need refile correctly. (TNS)
September 27, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #18 Opposition to Motion,, to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez. (LYNCH, PETER)
September 26, 2022 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Opposition to Motion,, to Remand by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (LYNCH, PETER)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (RM) granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Motion to Remand #5 to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands. Any Reply is due by September 26, 2022.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 19, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Opposition to Motion,, to Remand by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (LYNCH, PETER)
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 Opposition to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands filed by Defendant Citadel Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit VI LGOV page, #2 Exhibit LA SOS page, #3 Affidavit Fouquet Declaration, #4 Exhibit Prime Contract Exe 1-2, #5 Exhibit FEMA press release, #6 Exhibit Filing approval ST-22-CV-81, #7 Exhibit Sup Ct Complaint part1, #8 Exhibit Sup Ct Complaint part 2, #9 Exhibit VI Leg FCA Bill) (Kronenberger, Gregg)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (RM) granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands. Responses are due by September 12, 2022.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 8, 2022 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands by Defendant Citadel Recovery Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kronenberger, Gregg)
September 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure by AECOM CARIBE, LLP (Teague, G.)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (RM) granting #13 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands. Responses are due by September 8, 2022.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 29, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Citadel Recovery Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kronenberger, Gregg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Citadel Recovery Services, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Kronenberger, Gregg)
August 18, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, Defendant is required to file a Disclosure Statement.Re: #7 Notice of Appearance, #9 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance. (KW)
August 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal , MOTION for leave to File Document Under SealPleadings in Removed Action by Defendant Citadel Recovery Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kronenberger, Gregg)
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citadel Recovery Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citadel Recovery Services, LLC for Citadel Recovery Services, LLC.. (Lockwood, Charles)
August 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Jean Goulart on behalf of Defendant AECOM CARIBE, LLP (Goulart, Kristin)
August 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Alan Teague on behalf of Defendant AECOM CARIBE, LLP (Teague, G.)
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle T. Meade on behalf of Defendant AECOM CARIBE, LLP (Meade, Michelle)
August 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #3 Notice of Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, Defendant is required to file a Disclosure Statement. (EMK)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the Virgin Islands by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (LYNCH, PETER)
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER JAMES LYNCH on behalf of Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez (LYNCH, PETER)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Citadel Recovery Services, LLC (Lockwood, Charles)
August 15, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Filer is advised that when filing a Notice of Removal the attachments should include filings from the court it is being asked to be removed from to which consist of the complaint, summons, certificate of summons and any other pertinent supporting documents to the removal along with the District Court's civil cover sheet. Additionally, Filer is advised to file a civil cover sheet pursuant to LCRi 3.1. When filing the civil cover sheet use the event Notice (Other) referencing Notice of Filing as the docket text. The civil cover sheet will be an attachment to the notice and the document should be linked to the notice of removal. Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (KW)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg R Kronenberger on behalf of Defendant Citadel Recovery Services, LLC (Kronenberger, Gregg)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Abiel Cotto, Norberto Frese, David Gautreaux, Blaine Lambert, Braylin Lambert, Rafael Lugo, Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos, Benjamin Osorio, Jeremy Ramirez from Virgin Islands Superior Court, Div of St. Thomas and St. John, case number ST-2022-CV-00081. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1019336)filed by Citadel Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AECOM Consent to Removal) (Kronenberger, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotto et al v. Toliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abiel Cotto
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Osorio
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Enrique Camacho Mattos
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gautreaux
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ramirez
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Frese
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Lugo
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braylin Lambert
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine Lambert
Represented By: PETER JAMES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Sutton Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Gregg R Kronenberger
Represented By: Charles Edward Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM CARIBE, LLP
Represented By: Michelle T. Meade
Represented By: G. Alan Teague
Represented By: Kristin Jean Goulart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?