Moses et al v. Lake
Plaintiff: Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses and Melanie Moses
Defendant: Jerome Lake
Case Number: 3:2022cv00063
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 19 First MOTION to Amend Complaint Without Opposition by Plaintiffs Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Verified Complaint Redline, #2 Exhibit First Amended Verified Complaint Clean, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to First Amended Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to First Amended Verified Complaint, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (O'Shea, Craig)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (RAM) Defendant's unopposed motion, ECF #17 , is GRANTED. The preliminary injunction hearing previously scheduled for December 19, 2022, is rescheduled to commence at 10:00 A.M. on February 10, 2023, via Microsoft Teams. The parties shall adhere to the Court's directives in this Order. (SZ)
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, , Joint MOTION for Hearing Rescheduling by Defendant Jerome Lake. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Reschedule Hrg) (Belfon, Ronald)
December 12, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald W. Belfon on behalf of Defendant Jerome Lake (Belfon, Ronald)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RAM) Defendant's request for a continuance is GRANTED. The preliminary injunction hearing is CONTINUED to commence promptly at 10:00 A.M. on Monday December 19, 2022, via Microsoft Teams. Defendant shall adhere to the Courts directive set forth in this order, which shall remain in effect until the conclusion of the December 19, 2022 hearing, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant via email address Defendant provided. (SZ)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Robert A. Molloy: Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2022 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karris Moses, Kaleen Moses, Ivy Moses, Melanie Moses. (Court Reporter FTR Recorder.) (CAB)
November 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Complaint, Summons, Motion, and Memorandum by Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Shea, Craig)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of November 16, 2022 Order by Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses re #10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (O'Shea, Craig)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Moses, Ivy Moses, Karris Moses, Kaleen Moses. Jerome Lake served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (O'Shea, Craig)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (RAM) Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining Order is DENIED. A hearing on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction SHALL be held on November 22, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., via Microsoft Teams. Connectivity information shall be provided to the parties at a later time. (SZ)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 Response re #8 Order for Supplemental Briefing filed by Plaintiffs Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses. (O'Shea, Craig)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (RAM) No later than November 17, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental brief addressing whether and how the amount-in-controversy requirement for federal diversity jurisdiction is met in this case. (SZ)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
October 28, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jerome Lake. (TNS)
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Security by Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt for Payment of Security to Clerk of Court) (O'Shea, Craig)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Summons by Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (O'Shea, Craig)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Proof of Security - Redacted Check) (O'Shea, Craig)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Ivy Moses, Kaleen Moses, Karris Moses, Melanie Moses. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Shea, Craig)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Jerome Lake ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1031700.)filed by Melanie Moses, Ivy Moses, Karris Moses, Kaleen Moses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photographs depicting fence, #2 Exhibit Photographs depicting Moses family harvesting and selling fruit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Shea, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses et al v. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Moses
Represented By: Craig M. O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleen Moses
Represented By: Craig M. O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karris Moses
Represented By: Craig M. O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Moses
Represented By: Craig M. O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Lake
Represented By: Ronald W. Belfon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?