Walker v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Randall B. Walker
Defendant: John E. Doe, Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2023cv00004
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 22 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC. (Duensing, Matthew)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (RM) granting #18 Unopposed Motion Regarding Initial Conference. Rule 16 Conference previously set for April 25, 2023 at 02:00 PM is RESCHEDULED for April 25, 2023 at 03:00 PM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
March 20, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures by Randall B. Walker (Fischer, John)
March 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service by Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC (Duensing, Matthew)
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION Regarding April 25, 2023 Initial Conference (Unopposed) by Plaintiff Randall B. Walker. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fischer, John)
March 14, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC. (Duensing, Matthew)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (RM): On or before March 17, 2023, defendant shall file a disclosure statement that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) as amended December 1, 2022.
March 14, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC. (Duensing, Matthew)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (RM): No later than March 17, 2023, the defendant LLC shall refile its disclosure statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 13, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC. (Duensing, Matthew)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (RM) granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Continue Initial Conference. Rule 16 Conference previously set for March 28, 2023 is RESCHEDULED for April 25, 2023 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
February 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue (Joint) by Plaintiff Randall B. Walker. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fischer, John)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC. (Duensing, Matthew)
February 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin P. Seila on behalf of Defendant Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC (Seila, Robin)
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Sauerwein on behalf of Defendant Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC (Sauerwein, Joseph)
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Duensing on behalf of Defendant Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC (Duensing, Matthew)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randall B. Walker. John Doe served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Fischer, John)
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randall B. Walker. Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Fischer, John)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC. (IW)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe. (IW)
January 26, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons, re #2 , #3 . (IW)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1046570.)filed by John E. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Fischer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall B. Walker
Represented By: John P. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Doe
Represented By: John P. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handy Dagg Remodeling and Carpentry, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Sauerwein
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Represented By: Robin P. Seila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?